Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 110 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6627 Week
» 6627 Month
» 73489 Year
» 1738865 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

TVR/GWR Cameron "A" Class 0-6-2T


TVR GWR GWR (1947) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
411 303 02/1921 05/05/1956 35.25 751,787 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1956 35.59
413 305 03/1921 01/04/1957 36.08 745,328 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/05/1957 36.20
120 441 01/1915 30/10/1954 39.75 811,202 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/12/1955 40.91
7 335 11/1914 18/03/1954 39.33 739,373 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/07/1954 39.70
10 337 12/1914 09/02/1953 38.17
11 343 12/1914 05/10/1955 40.83 666,041 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1955 41.07
12 344 12/1914 18/11/1952 37.92
20 345 05/1920 22/09/1955 35.33 771,837 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/06/1956 36.11
45 346 08/1915 05/10/1955 40.17 834,772 40.41
75 347 12/1921 04/12/1956 35 763,357 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/04/1957 35.37
80 348 12/1921 05/05/1956 34.42 711,206 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/01/1957 35.14
90 349 12/1921 04/03/1957 35.25 674,489 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/07/1957 35.60
91 351 12/1921 09/07/1956 34.58 784,628 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/12/1956 35.06
122 352 08/1915 14/03/1955 39.58 859,405 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/07/1955 39.95
123 356 08/1915 03/01/1955 39.42 840,109 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/09/1955 40.10
124 357 08/1915 02/01/1956 40.42 795,296 40.64
125 360 07/1916 10/02/1955 38.58 810,893 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/03/1955 38.72
127 361 07/1916 29/01/1957 40.5 649,228 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/02/1957 40.64
128 362 07/1916 28/05/1956 39.83 514,584 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/07/1956 40.02
129 364 07/1916 04/03/1957 40.67 900,223 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/10/1957 41.25
130 365 07/1916 17/10/1955 39.25 760,950 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/03/1956 39.72
132 366 08/1916 10/10/1955 39.17 760,573 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 31/12/1955 39.40
133 367 02/1919 23/03/1956 37.08 758,406 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/05/1956 37.28
134 368 05/1920 24/10/1956 36.42 730,291 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/12/1956 36.57
135 370 02/1919 13/08/1957 38.5 618,242 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/10/1957 38.66
136 371 03/1919 18/01/1955 35.83 684,132 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/06/1955 36.28
138 372 03/1919 23/02/1955 35.92 786,346 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/04/1955 36.13
139 373 04/1919 26/08/1957 38.33 810,350 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/05/1958 39.12
140 374 04/1919 19/09/1955 36.42 657,402 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/04/1956 37.04
144 375 05/1920 22/11/1954 34.5 736,160 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/07/1955 35.19
149 376 05/1920 14/01/1957 36.67 755,546 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/09/1957 37.34
154 377 05/1919 14/05/1956 37 848,431 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/09/1956 37.35
156 378 05/1919 17/12/1956 37.58 717,464 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/05/1957 38.04
157 379 05/1919 27/02/1956 36.75 813,626 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/04/1956 36.96
158 380 07/1919 22/10/1956 37.25 684,151 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/02/1957 37.64
159 381 07/1919 26/08/1957 38.08 630,157 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1957 38.33
160 382 07/1919 26/04/1956 36.75 830,988 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/10/1956 37.25
162 383 05/1920 12/08/1957 37.25 797,402 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1957 37.49
164 384 06/1920 13/02/1956 35.67 799,754 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/04/1956 35.87
165 385 06/1920 01/04/1957 36.83 656,383 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/05/1957 36.95
400 386 06/1920 27/04/1956 35.83 857,104 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/06/1956 36.03
401 387 07/1920 05/11/1956 36.33 850,566 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/12/1956 36.48
402 388 08/1920 01/10/1956 36.17 782,915 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/04/1957 36.70
403 389 09/1920 20/01/1956 35.33 762,250 36.01
404 390 09/1920 26/08/1957 36.92 668,888 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/11/1957 37.23
405 391 10/1920 03/09/1956 35.92 747,312 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/12/1956 36.23
406 393 11/1920 13/05/1957 36.5 731,608 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 15/06/1957 36.61
407 394 12/1920 09/07/1956 35.58 789,633 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/03/1959 38.29
408 397 12/1920 01/04/1957 36.33 640,501 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/10/1957 36.83
409 398 01/1921 13/08/1957 36.58 623,646 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/12/1957 36.98
410 399 01/1921 03/09/1956 35.67 695,970 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/10/1956 35.75
412 402 304 02/1921 12/08/1957 36.5 661,941 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/10/1957 36.66
414 404 306 12/1921 16/04/1956 34.33 792,253 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/05/1956 34.45
415 406 307 12/1921 13/03/1956 34.25 656,231 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/08/1956 34.68
416 408 308 12/1921 19/12/1955 34 641,754 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/02/1956 34.22
3 438 309 10/1914 16/02/1953 38.33
42 439 312 08/1915 11/06/1956 40.83 881,057 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/11/1956 41.25
52 440 316 08/1915 23/07/1956 40.92 828,608 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/10/1956 41.17