Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 48 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 4394 Month
» 71256 Year
» 1736632 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Dean "36xx" Class 2-4-2T


GWR GWR (1912 Renum) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
11 3600 12/1900 12/06/1933 32.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/09/1933 32.79
3601 02/1902 03/1931 29.08
3602 02/1902 02/1931 29
3603 03/1902 05/1931 29.17
3604 03/1902 11/1934 32.67
3605 04/1902 12/1930 28.67
3606 04/1902 03/1931 28.92
3607 05/1902 04/1931 28.92
3608 05/1902 04/1931 28.92
3609 05/1902 03/1932 29.83
3610 05/1902 11/1934 32.5
3611 06/1902 02/1931 28.67
3612 06/1902 10/1930 28.33
3613 06/1902 05/1932 29.92
3614 06/1902 04/1931 28.83
3615 07/1902 04/1931 28.75
3616 07/1902 20/09/1933 31.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 13/01/1934 31.52
3617 07/1902 29/03/1933 30.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 30/06/1934 31.98
3618 07/1902 11/1934 32.33
3619 08/1902 04/1931 28.67
3620 08/1902 05/1931 28.75
3621 10/1903 05/01/1933 29.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 08/04/1933 29.50
3622 10/1903 05/1932 28.58
3623 11/1903 04/1931 27.42
3624 11/1903 10/1931 27.92
3625 11/1903 07/1931 27.67
3626 12/1903 08/1932 28.67
3627 12/1903 20/01/1934 30.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/02/1934 30.18
3628 12/1903 11/1934 30.92
3629 12/1903 11/1931 27.92
3630 12/1903 10/1930 26.83