Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 380 Today
» 2338 Yesterday
» 5283 Week
» 81385 Month
» 566604 Year
» 2967068 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

GWR Churchward "4300" Class 2-6-0


GWR (Orig) GWR (1st Renum) GWR (2nd Renum) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
4300 11/1916 07/1937 20.67
4301 06/1911 08/1936 25.17
4302 06/1911 06/1938 27
4303 06/1911 07/11/1952 41.42
4304 07/1911 10/1938 27.25
4305 07/1911 08/1937 26.08
4306 07/1911 06/1937 25.92
4307 07/1911 03/1938 26.67
4308 08/1911 04/1937 25.67
4309 08/1911 02/1936 24.5
4310 08/1911 08/1936 25
4311 08/1911 12/1936 25.33
4312 09/1911 03/1938 26.5
4313 09/1911 02/1936 Warrington Dallam 24.42
4314 09/1911 06/1937 25.75
4315 09/1911 04/1937 25.58
4316 09/1911 09/1937 26
4317 10/1911 06/1937 25.67
4318 10/1911 04/06/1952 40.67
4319 10/1911 05/1938 26.58
4320 10/1911 03/01/1949 37.25
4321 06/1913 09/1937 24.25
4322 06/1913 09/1937 24.25
4323 07/1913 10/1936 23.25
4324 07/1913 12/1936 23.42
4325 08/1913 04/1938 24.67
4326 08/1913 27/03/1957 43.58 1,449,875 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 18/05/1957 43.79
4327 08/1913 01/1937 23.42
4328 08/1913 08/1938 25
4329 08/1913 09/1936 23.08
4330 08/1913 08/1937 24
4331 09/1913 02/1936 22.42
4332 09/1913 02/1936 22.42
4333 09/1913 02/1937 23.42
4334 09/1913 10/1936 23.08
4335 09/1913 11/1936 23.17
4336 09/1913 07/1938 24.83
4337 10/1913 05/11/1951 38.08
4338 10/1913 02/1937 23.33
4339 10/1913 01/1939 25.25
4340 10/1913 08/1936 22.83
4341 12/1913 08/1936 22.67
4342 12/1913 05/1938 24.42
4343 01/1914 10/1937 23.75
4344 01/1914 07/1936 22.5
4345 01/1914 08/1936 22.58
4346 01/1914 11/1936 22.83
4347 01/1914 01/1937 23
4348 01/1914 02/1937 23.08
4349 02/1914 06/1938 24.33
4350 02/1914 03/1936 22.08
4351 02/1914 08/1936 22.5
4352 02/1914 08/1937 23.5
4353 03/1914 29/11/1948 Birkenhead Mollington Street 34.67
4354 03/1914 02/1939 24.92
4355 03/1914 06/1938 24.25
4356 03/1914 04/1936 22.08
4357 04/1914 11/1936 22.58
4358 04/1914 11/08/1959 45.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
4359 04/1914 05/1937 23.08
4360 05/1914 05/1938 24
4361 05/1915 02/1939 23.75
4362 05/1915 08/1937 22.25
4363 06/1915 02/1939 23.67
4364 06/1915 02/1936 20.67
4365 07/1915 10/04/1948 32.75
4366 07/1915 02/1937 21.58
4367 07/1915 01/1939 23.5
4368 08/1915 02/1939 23.5
4369 09/1915 02/1938 22.42
4370 09/1915 01/1937 21.33
4371 10/1915 11/1938 23.08
4372 10/1915 09/1936 20.92
4373 10/1915 08/1937 21.83
4374 11/1915 01/1937 21.17
4375 11/1915 06/01/1958 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 22/02/1958 42.30
4376 12/1915 11/1936 20.92
4377 12/1915 26/01/1959 43.08
4378 12/1915 01/1937 21.08
4379 12/1915 02/1938 22.17
4380 12/1915 07/1938 22.58
4381 05/1916 28/05/1953 37
4382 05/1916 01/1938 21.67
4383 06/1916 03/1936 19.75
4384 06/1916 08/1936 20.17
4385 06/1916 02/1939 22.67
4386 07/1916 24/04/1948 31.75
4387 07/1916 03/1936 19.67
4388 07/1916 01/1939 22.5
4389 08/1916 10/1937 21.17
4390 08/1916 02/1939 22.5
4391 08/1916 02/1937 20.5
4392 09/1916 12/1938 22.25
4393 09/1916 08/1937 20.92
4394 09/1916 08/1938 21.92
4395 09/1916 07/1936 19.83
4396 09/1916 06/1937 20.75
4397 10/1916 03/1936 19.42
4398 10/1916 08/1936 19.83
4399 11/1916 05/1938 21.5
5300 8300 5300 11/1916 15/01/1953 36.17
5301 8301 12/1916 10/1937 20.83
5302 8302 5302 12/1916 26/05/1948 31.42
5303 12/1916 28/05/1951 34.42
5304 8304 12/1916 05/1937 20.42
5305 8305 5305 01/1917 01/07/1952 35.5
5306 01/1917 06/07/1964 47.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5307 8307 5307 01/1917 26/11/1956 39.83 1,306,679 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/01/1957 40.06
5308 8308 02/1917 01/1939 21.92
5309 8309 5309 02/1917 27/01/1953 35.92
5310 06/1917 31/07/1958 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/11/1958 41.48
5311 06/1917 24/10/1960 43.33
5312 06/1917 24/10/1958 41.33 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan)
5313 8313 5313 06/1917 13/05/1958 40.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/10/1958 41.35
5314 8314 5314 06/1917 22/07/1957 40.08 1,183,059 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 07/09/1957 40.26
5315 8315 5315 07/1917 17/02/1959 41.58
5316 07/1917 21/06/1956 38.92 1,140,270 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/08/1956 39.10
5317 07/1917 05/11/1956 39.33 1,169,742 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/12/1956 39.48
5318 8318 5318 07/1917 04/09/1961 44.17
5319 08/1917 16/11/1959 42.25
5320 8320 5320 08/1917 27/09/1948 31.08
5321 08/1917 14/09/1959 42.08
5322 8322 5322 08/1917 24/04/1964 46.67 Prs Preserved
5323 09/1917 09/06/1958 40.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 09/08/1958 40.93
5324 09/1917 16/09/1960 43
5325 8325 5325 09/1917 26/08/1957 39.92 1,279,486 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 02/11/1957 40.16
5326 8326 5326 09/1917 15/03/1962 44.5
5327 8327 5327 09/1917 02/07/1956 38.83 1,293,226 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/08/1956 38.93
5328 8328 5328 09/1917 29/07/1958 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/10/1958 41.08
5329 8329 09/1917 03/1939 21.5
5330 09/1917 15/06/1964 46.75
5331 8331 5331 09/1917 10/11/1960 43.17
5332 8332 5332 11/1917 09/10/1961 43.92
5333 8333 5333 11/1917 16/05/1960 42.5
5334 8334 5334 11/1917 18/11/1957 40 1,255,557 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/12/1957 40.15
5335 8335 5335 12/1917 16/10/1958 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/12/1958 41.06
5336 12/1917 07/09/1964 46.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
5337 8337 5337 12/1917 24/10/1960 42.83
5338 8338 5338 01/1918 11/08/1958 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 04/10/1958 40.75
5339 01/1918 29/11/1960 42.83
5340 8340 5340 01/1918 27/09/1948 30.67
5341 8341 5341 02/1918 28/07/1959 41.42
5342 8342 02/1918 04/1937 19.17
5343 8343 5343 02/1918 03/07/1948 30.42
5344 8344 5344 03/1918 22/09/1958 40.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/11/1958 40.74
5345 03/1918 08/06/1959 41.25
5346 03/1918 07/05/1951 33.17
5347 03/1918 21/04/1958 40.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 14/06/1958 40.28
5348 03/1918 04/01/1952 33.83
5349 04/1918 10/05/1948 30.08
5350 8350 5350 07/1918 07/12/1959 41.42
5351 8351 5351 08/1918 13/06/1961 42.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5352 8352 08/1918 06/1937 18.83
5353 8353 5353 08/1918 02/05/1960 41.75
5354 8354 08/1918 05/1937 18.75
5355 08/1918 23/04/1959 40.67
5356 08/1918 12/10/1959 41.17
5357 8357 5357 09/1918 21/09/1962 44 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5358 8358 5358 09/1918 17/07/1962 43.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
5359 8359 5359 09/1918 22/10/1951 33.08
5360 8360 5360 01/1919 26/09/1958 39.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/11/1958 39.82
5361 8361 5361 02/1919 18/01/1960 40.92
5362 8362 5362 02/1919 22/07/1958 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/09/1958 39.58
5363 8363 02/1919 09/1937 18.58
5364 8364 5364 03/1919 16/07/1951 32.33
5365 8365 5365 04/1919 05/03/1951 31.92
5366 8366 05/1919 03/1939 19.83
5367 05/1919 29/09/1958 39.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/01/1959 39.72
5368 8368 5368 06/1919 25/09/1958 39.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 29/11/1958 39.48
5369 8369 5369 06/1919 20/11/1963 44.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5370 06/1919 16/09/1960 41.25
5371 07/1919 04/07/1958 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/09/1958 39.17
5372 8372 5372 07/1919 04/07/1958 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 06/09/1958 39.17
5373 8373 5373 07/1919 12/06/1950 30.92
5374 8374 5374 07/1919 14/06/1948 28.92
5375 08/1919 19/10/1959 40.17
5376 8376 5376 08/1919 08/06/1962 42.83
5377 08/1919 22/09/1958 39.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 27/12/1958 39.39
5378 8378 5378 08/1919 14/09/1959 40.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5379 8379 5379 08/1919 13/05/1958 38.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/07/1958 38.93
5380 04/1920 23/09/1963 43.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5381 8381 5381 06/1920 01/09/1959 39.25
5382 8382 5382 06/1920 23/04/1959 38.83
5383 8383 07/1920 05/1937 16.83
5384 8384 5384 07/1920 11/10/1960 40.25
5385 08/1920 13/07/1962 41.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5386 8386 5386 08/1920 20/10/1958 38.17 Cut Hayes (Bridgend)
5387 8387 08/1920 03/1939 18.58
5388 8388 5388 08/1920 09/03/1959 38.58
5389 8389 09/1920 05/1937 16.67
5390 8390 5390 10/1920 13/08/1958 37.83 Cut Hayes (Bridgend)
5391 8391 5391 10/1920 18/03/1957 36.42 1,145,457 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 20/04/1957 36.54
5392 10/1920 27/08/1958 37.83 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan)
5393 8393 5393 10/1920 05/10/1959 39
5394 10/1920 07/01/1959 38.25
5395 10/1920 10/10/1955 35 964,800 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/12/1955 35.16
5396 11/1920 09/05/1960 39.5
5397 11/1920 24/07/1958 37.67 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan)
5398 11/1920 23/02/1959 38.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
5399 11/1920 17/09/1962 41.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6300 11/1920 27/06/1960 39.58
6301 12/1920 15/10/1962 41.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6302 12/1920 29/03/1962 41.25
6303 12/1920 01/04/1959 38.33
6304 12/1920 15/01/1964 43.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6305 12/1920 01/09/1959 38.75
6306 12/1920 21/11/1961 40.92
6307 01/1921 25/07/1960 39.5
6308 01/1921 24/08/1959 38.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6309 01/1921 07/09/1964 43.67
6310 01/1921 05/07/1962 41.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6311 01/1921 18/01/1960 39
6312 01/1921 21/09/1962 41.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6313 01/1921 21/11/1961 40.83
6314 01/1921 24/05/1963 42.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6315 01/1921 24/10/1945 24.75
6316 01/1921 25/07/1962 41.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6317 01/1921 20/11/1963 42.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6318 02/1921 05/01/1959 37.92
6319 02/1921 26/08/1963 42.5
6320 02/1921 20/11/1963 42.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6321 02/1921 19/03/1956 35.08 1,084,625 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/06/1956 35.36
6322 02/1921 05/01/1959 37.92
6323 03/1921 11/07/1960 39.33
6324 03/1921 02/04/1962 41.08
6325 03/1921 23/11/1959 38.67
6326 03/1921 07/09/1964 43.5
6327 03/1921 23/09/1963 42.5 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
6328 03/1921 19/01/1959 37.83
6329 04/1921 19/10/1961 40.5
6330 04/1921 21/09/1962 41.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6331 04/1921 20/04/1959 38
6332 04/1921 16/09/1960 39.42
6333 05/1921 24/10/1960 39.42
6334 05/1921 06/04/1959 37.92
6335 05/1921 02/07/1963 42.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6336 05/1921 05/04/1962 40.92
6337 06/1921 06/07/1964 43.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6338 06/1921 15/06/1964 43
6339 06/1921 31/07/1962 41.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6340 06/1921 13/07/1962 41.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6341 07/1921 13/11/1961 40.33
6342 03/1923 17/09/1962 39.5
6343 03/1923 21/09/1960 37.5
6344 03/1923 20/11/1963 40.67
6345 04/1923 07/09/1964 41.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
6346 04/1923 07/09/1964 41.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6347 04/1923 28/12/1963 40.67
6348 04/1923 19/02/1962 38.83
6349 05/1923 10/08/1964 41.25
6350 05/1923 06/01/1964 40.67
6351 05/1923 21/11/1960 37.5
6352 09/1923 21/11/1960 37.17
6353 09/1923 24/05/1963 39.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6354 10/1923 23/02/1959 35.33
6355 10/1923 02/03/1959 35.42
6356 11/1923 14/01/1963 39.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6357 11/1923 13/07/1964 40.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6358 11/1923 12/10/1959 35.92
6359 11/1923 07/09/1959 35.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6360 11/1923 21/11/1960 37
6361 12/1923 06/05/1964 40.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
6362 04/1925 01/09/1962 37.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6363 04/1925 07/09/1964 39.42
6364 05/1925 21/11/1964 39.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6365 10/1925 21/10/1963 38
6366 10/1925 17/09/1962 36.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6367 10/1925 06/11/1964 39.08
6368 10/1925 16/12/1963 38.17
6369 10/1925 11/02/1963 37.33
6370 04/1921 14/01/1963 41.75
6371 05/1921 21/09/1960 39.33
6372 05/1921 28/12/1963 42.58
6373 06/1921 28/12/1963 42.5
6374 05/1921 03/08/1962 41.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6375 06/1921 17/09/1963 42.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
6376 06/1921 14/05/1962 40.92
6377 06/1921 24/10/1960 39.33
6378 07/1921 15/06/1964 42.92
6379 07/1921 26/08/1963 42.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6380 07/1921 28/12/1963 42.42
6381 07/1921 20/11/1963 42.33
6382 08/1921 21/11/1960 39.25
6383 08/1921 07/05/1956 34.75 1,132,000 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/03/1957 35.63
6384 08/1921 24/06/1963 41.83
6385 08/1921 02/12/1963 42.33
6386 09/1921 05/09/1962 41
6387 09/1921 22/06/1962 40.75
6388 10/1921 21/09/1962 40.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6389 10/1921 21/09/1960 38.92
6390 10/1921 14/05/1962 40.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
6391 11/1921 17/09/1962 40.83
6392 11/1921 19/10/1961 39.92
6393 11/1921 11/01/1960 38.17
6394 11/1921 15/06/1964 42.58
6395 12/1921 21/11/1964 42.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
6396 12/1921 03/03/1958 36.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) 19/04/1958 36.37
6397 12/1921 14/09/1959 37.75
6398 12/1921 24/10/1960 38.83
6399 12/1921 16/11/1959 37.92
7300 12/1921 21/09/1962 40.75
7301 12/1921 21/09/1962 40.75
7302 12/1921 24/08/1962 40.67
7303 01/1922 07/09/1964 42.67
7304 01/1922 02/12/1963 41.92
7305 11/1921 17/09/1962 40.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
7306 11/1921 01/09/1964 42.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
7307 11/1921 01/06/1964 42.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
7308 11/1921 15/06/1964 42.58
7309 11/1921 27/09/1962 40.83
7310 12/1921 15/06/1964 42.5
7311 12/1921 17/09/1962 40.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
7312 12/1921 28/12/1963 42
7313 12/1921 03/07/1962 40.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
7314 12/1921 26/02/1963 41.17
7315 12/1921 16/12/1963 42
7316 12/1921 17/09/1962 40.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
7317 12/1921 28/12/1963 42
7318 12/1921 06/11/1964 42.92
7319 01/1922 09/10/1964 42.75
7320 04/1925 06/11/1964 39.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
7321 04/1925 21/09/1962 37.42
9300 7322 02/1932 03/11/1961 29.75
9301 7323 02/1932 10/08/1962 30.5
9302 7324 02/1932 22/10/1962 30.67
9303 7325 02/1932 24/04/1964 32.17 Prs Preserved
9304 7326 02/1932 17/09/1963 31.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
9305 7327 02/1932 06/11/1964 32.75
9306 7328 03/1932 03/04/1962 30.08
9307 7329 03/1932 07/01/1963 30.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
9308 7330 03/1932 25/09/1962 30.5
9309 7331 03/1932 01/09/1962 30.5
9310 7332 03/1932 08/04/1964 32.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport)
9311 7333 03/1932 03/10/1963 31.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston)
9312 7334 03/1932 03/04/1962 30.08
9313 7335 03/1932 10/09/1963 31.5
9314 7336 03/1932 17/09/1962 30.5
9315 7337 03/1932 01/09/1964 32.5
9316 7338 04/1932 10/08/1962 30.33
9317 7339 04/1932 15/06/1964 32.17
9318 7340 04/1932 15/06/1964 32.17
9319 7341 04/1932 17/09/1962 30.42