Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 260 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16567 Week
» 68452 Month
» 693807 Year
» 3720660 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

GWR Collett "3100" Class 2-6-2T


GWR GWR (31xx) Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3155 3103 04/1907 22/08/1939
from 3150
14/01/1960 52.75
3156 3101 04/1907 21/02/1939
from 3150
23/09/1957 50.42 385,558 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/02/1961 53.90
3173 3100 10/1907 10/12/1938
from 3150
20/05/1957 49.58 463,836 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 25/02/1961 53.40
3179 3104 11/1907 18/10/1939
from 3150
24/06/1957 49.58 367,796 Cut Locomotive Works (Stafford Road, Wolverhampton) 15/07/1957 49.70
3181 3102 12/1907 19/05/1939
from 3150
06/10/1958 50.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 28/01/1961 53.16