Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 401 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5876 Week
» 5876 Month
» 72738 Year
» 1738114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "E3" Class 0-6-2T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2165 32165 11/1894 07/11/1959 65 65.04
2166 32166 11/1894 26/09/1959 64.83 64.96
2167 32167 12/1894 01/10/1955 60.83 61.29
2168 32168 12/1894 28/01/1956 61.08 61.29
2169 32169 12/1894 08/1955 60.67
2170 32170 12/1894 13/07/1957 62.58 62.71
2453 32453 04/1895 08/1955 60.33
2454 32454 05/1895 29/03/1958 62.83 63.04
2455 32455 05/1895 24/02/1958 62.75 62.87
2456 32456 05/1895 15/08/1959 64.25 64.46
2457 32457 12/1895 05/1949 53.42 53.45
2458 32458 12/1895 09/03/1957 61.25 61.45
2459 32459 12/1895 02/06/1956 60.5 60.62
2460 32460 12/1895 04/1956 60.33 60.37
2461 32461 12/1895 06/04/1957 61.33 61.45
2462 32462 12/1895 11/05/1957 61.42 61.54