Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 524 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5999 Week
» 5999 Month
» 72861 Year
» 1738237 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SR Billinton "E6" Class 0-6-2T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2408 32408 12/1904 23/12/1962 58 58.21
2409 32409 12/1904 18/01/1958 53.08 53.28
2410 32410 03/1905 17/06/1961 56.25 56.46
2412 32412 07/1905 07/09/1957 52.17 52.21
2413 32413 07/1905 02/1958 52.58 53.62
2414 32414 10/1905 07/06/1958 52.67 52.70
2415 32415 10/1905 23/09/1961 55.92 56.12
2416 32416 11/1905 10/02/1962 56.25 56.37
2417 32417 12/1905 23/12/1962 57 57.87
2418 32418 12/1905 23/12/1962 57 57.62