Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 4384 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 15310 Week
» 108544 Month
» 568485 Year
» 5007922 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

SR Maunsell "Z" Class 0-8-0T


SR (1931) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
950 30950 04/1929 20/10/1962 33.5 33.69
951 30951 05/1929 24/11/1962 33.5 34.86
952 30952 05/1929 24/11/1962 33.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1965 35.70
953 30953 06/1929 15/12/1962 33.5 33.61
954 30954 09/1929 08/12/1962 33.25 33.44
955 30955 07/1929 12/1962 33.42 33.77
956 30956 03/1929 22/12/1962 33.75 33.86
957 30957 08/1929 17/11/1962 33.25 33.36