Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3378 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13672 Week
» 149077 Month
» 609018 Year
» 5048455 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
SECR/SR Wainwright "E" Class 4-4-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1036
|
31036
|
12/1908 |
|
10/03/1951 |
|
42.25 |
|
|
|
42.27 |
1157
|
31157
|
12/1907 |
|
03/1951 |
|
43.25 |
|
|
|
43.36 |
1159
|
31159
|
11/1908 |
|
12/1951 |
|
43.08 |
|
|
|
|
1166
|
31166
|
07/1907 |
|
21/05/1955 |
|
47.83 |
|
|
|
|
1175
|
31175
|
08/1908 |
|
10/1951 |
|
43.17 |
|
|
|
|
1176
|
31176
|
12/1907 |
|
10/1951 |
|
43.83 |
|
|
|
|
1273
|
31273
|
02/1906 |
|
12/1951 |
|
45.83 |
|
|
|
45.86 |
1275
|
31275
|
02/1906 |
|
03/1951 |
|
45.08 |
|
|
|
45.19 |
1315
|
31315
|
04/1909 |
|
20/03/1954 |
|
44.92 |
|
|
|
45.53 |
1491
|
31491
|
07/1907 |
|
02/1953 |
|
45.58 |
|
|
|
45.87 |
1514
|
31514
|
12/1907 |
|
12/1951 |
|
44 |
|
|
|
|
1515
|
31515
|
09/1907 |
|
21/07/1951 |
|
43.83 |
|
|
|
|
1516
|
31516
|
04/1908 |
|
06/10/1951 |
|
43.5 |
|
|
|
|
1547
|
31547
|
09/1908 |
|
02/1951 |
|
42.42 |
|
|
|
42.61 |
1587
|
31587
|
02/1907 |
|
28/07/1951 |
|
44.42 |
|
|
|
|