Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4308 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 15234 Week
» 108468 Month
» 568409 Year
» 5007846 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
SR Maunsell "L1" Class 4-4-0
SR (1931) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1753
|
31753
|
03/1926 |
|
14/10/1961 |
|
35.58 |
|
|
|
35.61 |
1754
|
31754
|
03/1926 |
|
18/11/1961 |
|
35.67 |
|
|
|
35.70 |
1755
|
31755
|
03/1926 |
|
08/08/1959 |
|
33.42 |
|
|
|
33.53 |
1756
|
31756
|
03/1926 |
|
07/10/1961 |
|
35.58 |
|
|
|
35.78 |
1757
|
31757
|
03/1926 |
|
09/12/1961 |
|
35.75 |
|
|
|
37.02 |
1758
|
31758
|
03/1926 |
|
24/10/1959 |
|
33.58 |
|
|
|
33.69 |
1759
|
31759
|
04/1926 |
|
11/11/1961 |
|
35.58 |
|
|
|
35.78 |
1782
|
31782
|
04/1926 |
|
25/02/1961 |
|
34.83 |
|
|
|
35.11 |
1783
|
31783
|
04/1926 |
|
02/12/1961 |
|
35.67 |
|
|
|
35.86 |
1784
|
31784
|
04/1926 |
|
06/02/1960 |
|
33.83 |
|
|
|
34.11 |
1785
|
31785
|
04/1926 |
|
30/01/1960 |
|
33.75 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
1786
|
31786
|
04/1926 |
|
10/02/1962 |
|
35.83 |
|
|
|
35.86 |
1787
|
31787
|
04/1926 |
|
28/01/1961 |
|
34.75 |
|
|
|
35.02 |
1788
|
31788
|
04/1926 |
|
30/01/1960 |
|
33.75 |
|
|
|
34.19 |
1789
|
31789
|
04/1926 |
|
02/12/1961 |
|
35.67 |
|
|
|
35.69 |