SR Maunsell "V" Class 4-4-0
SR (1931) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
900 | 30900 | 03/1930 | 10/02/1962 | 31.92 | 32.02 | |||||
901 | 30901 | 03/1930 | 22/12/1962 | 32.75 | 33.44 | |||||
902 | 30902 | 04/1930 | 30/12/1962 | 32.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1964 | 34.02 | ||
903 | 30903 | 04/1930 | 30/12/1962 | 32.67 | 33.86 | |||||
904 | 30904 | 05/1930 | 08/07/1961 | 31.17 | 31.36 | |||||
905 | 30905 | 05/1930 | 09/12/1961 | 31.58 | 31.78 | |||||
906 | 30906 | 06/1930 | 23/12/1962 | 32.5 | 32.85 | |||||
907 | 30907 | 07/1930 | 09/09/1961 | 31.17 | 31.19 | |||||
908 | 30908 | 07/1930 | 23/09/1961 | 31.17 | 31.27 | |||||
909 | 30909 | 07/1930 | 17/02/1962 | 31.58 | 31.69 | |||||
910 | 30910 | 11/1932 | 25/11/1961 | 29 | 29.19 | |||||
911 | 30911 | 12/1932 | 30/12/1962 | 30 | 30.77 | |||||
912 | 30912 | 12/1932 | 01/12/1962 | 30 | 30.10 | |||||
913 | 30913 | 12/1932 | 27/01/1962 | 29.08 | 29.19 | |||||
914 | 30914 | 12/1932 | 22/07/1961 | 28.58 | 28.77 | |||||
915 | 30915 | 05/1933 | 23/12/1962 | 29.58 | 30.52 | |||||
916 | 30916 | 12/1933 | 30/12/1962 | 29 | 29.77 | |||||
917 | 30917 | 06/1933 | 24/11/1962 | 29.42 | 29.85 | |||||
918 | 30918 | 06/1933 | 14/10/1961 | 28.33 | 28.44 | |||||
919 | 30919 | 06/1933 | 02/1961 | 27.67 | 27.77 | |||||
920 | 30920 | 10/1933 | 25/11/1961 | 28.08 | 28.27 | |||||
921 | 30921 | 11/1933 | 30/12/1962 | 29.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1964 | 30.52 | ||
922 | 30922 | 12/1933 | 25/11/1961 | 27.92 | 28.10 | |||||
923 | 30923 | 12/1933 | 30/12/1962 | 29 | 29.68 | |||||
924 | 30924 | 12/1933 | 13/01/1962 | 28.08 | 28.10 | |||||
925 | 30925 | 04/1934 | 30/12/1962 | 28.67 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
926 | 30926 | 05/1934 | 30/12/1962 | 28.58 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
927 | 30927 | 06/1934 | 20/01/1962 | 27.58 | 27.77 | |||||
928 | 30928 | 06/1934 | 17/11/1962 | 28.42 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
929 | 30929 | 07/1934 | 08/12/1962 | 28.42 | 28.68 | |||||
930 | 30930 | 12/1934 | 30/12/1962 | 28 | 29.35 | |||||
931 | 30931 | 12/1934 | 23/09/1961 | 26.75 | 26.85 | |||||
932 | 30932 | 02/1935 | 02/1961 | 26 | 26.52 | |||||
933 | 30933 | 02/1935 | 11/11/1961 | 26.75 | 26.85 | |||||
934 | 30934 | 03/1935 | 30/12/1962 | 27.75 | 28.44 | |||||
935 | 30935 | 05/1935 | 23/12/1962 | 27.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1964 | 29.02 | ||
936 | 30936 | 06/1935 | 23/12/1962 | 27.5 | 28.35 | |||||
937 | 30937 | 06/1935 | 08/12/1962 | 27.5 | 28.02 | |||||
938 | 30938 | 07/1935 | 08/07/1961 | 26 | 26.19 | |||||
939 | 30939 | 07/1935 | 10/06/1961 | 25.92 | 26.19 |