Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 21 Today
» 861 Yesterday
» 5314 Week
» 21 Month
» 203511 Year
» 1868887 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "2F" Class 0-6-2T


LNWR LNWR (Duplicate) LMS LMS (Duplicate) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
602 7568 09/1881 1932 50.25
627 7570 09/1881 06/1927 45.75
971 7574 09/1881 01/1929 47.33
703 7571 27571 09/1881 08/1946 64.92
957 7573 09/1881 1932 50.25
766 7572 27572 09/1881 11/1946 65.17
1060 7575 27575 09/1881 12/1938 57.25
102 7576 09/1881 09/1934 53
119 3710 7577 27577 09/1881 02/1946 64.42
141 7578 09/1881 08/1928 46.92
313 3119 7579 10/1881 08/1928 46.83
205 3154 7580 27580 58883 10/1881 31/12/1949 Edge Hill 68.17 68.21
207 3206 7581 10/1881 02/1929 47.33
208 3292 7582 10/1881 1931 49.17
227 3737 7551 27551 10/1881 11/1938 57.08
68 3707 7584 10/1881 08/1932 50.83
850 7583 27583 10/1881 01/1937 55.25
232 3738 7585 27585 58884 10/1881 13/11/1948 67.08 67.21
239 3740 7586 27586 58885 11/1881 18/09/1948 66.83
241 3742 7587 11/1881 09/1932 50.83
242 3743 7588 11/1881 11/1932 51
243 3744 7589 11/1881 09/1925 43.83
244 3745 7590 27590 11/1881 11/1947 66
246 3746 7591 27591 58886 12/1881 01/1949 67.08
247 3747 7592 27592 12/1881 01/1936 54.08
248 3748 7593 27593 12/1881 04/1938 56.33
249 3749 7594 27594 12/1881 08/1938 56.67
251 3750 7595 12/1881 06/1930 48.5
252 3751 7596 27596 58887 12/1881 09/04/1955 73.33
142 3718 12/1881 07/1922 40.58
2458 7597 27597 08/1882 11/1947 65.25
2459 7598 08/1882 06/1927 44.83
2460 7599 08/1882 12/1930 48.33
2461 7600 27600 08/1882 07/1937 54.92
2462 7601 08/1882 1931 48.33
2463 7602 27602 58888 08/1882 30/09/1954 72.08 72.30
996 7607 08/1882 11/1930 48.25
991 7554 08/1882 11/1928 46.25
701 7605 27605 08/1882 04/1946 63.67
770 7553 27553 58880 08/1882 30/04/1954 71.67
605 7569 08/1882 11/1928 46.25
611 7552 27552 09/1882 08/1947 64.92
682 7604 27604 09/1882 03/1946 63.5
292 3053 7609 27609 09/1882 04/1946 63.58
679 7603 27603 58889 09/1882 31/08/1953 70.92
717 7606 27606 09/1882 11/1946 64.17
140 3716 7610 09/1882 1932 49.25
157 3725 7611 09/1882 1931 48.25
158 3726 7612 09/1882 04/1927 44.58
267 3756 7613 09/1882 1932 49.25
693 7614 09/1882 11/1930 48.17
997 7608 27608 09/1882 10/1934 52.08
268 3757 7615 27615 09/1882 03/1936 53.5
269 3758 7616 27616 09/1882 12/1945 63.25
270 3759 7617 09/1882 10/1928 46.08
272 3760 7618 27618 01/1883 10/1947 64.75
273 3761 7619 27619 58890 01/1883 11/1949 66.83 66.96
274 3762 7620 01/1883 04/1928 45.25
277 3763 7621 27621 58891 01/1883 08/1955 72.58 73.72
281 3764 7622 01/1883 04/1927 44.25
673 7624 27624 01/1883 06/1946 63.42
797 7626 27626 01/1883 11/1944 61.83
1009 7627 27627 58893 01/1883 16/10/1948 65.75 65.88
629 7623 27623 02/1883 11/1944 61.75
747 7625 27625 58892 02/1883 24/05/1952 69.25
1015 7556 02/1883 09/1924 41.58
671 7649 02/1883 1933 49.83
607 7647 02/1883 02/1928 45
690 7650 27650 02/1883 03/1946 63.08
615 7648 27648 02/1883 01/1948 64.92
2473 7628 02/1883 04/1927 44.17
2474 7629 02/1883 05/1928 45.25
2475 7630 02/1883 12/1934 51.83
2476 7631 02/1883 09/1944 61.58
2477 7632 02/1883 07/1933 50.42
2478 7633 02/1883 06/1926 43.33
2479 7634 03/1883 05/1929 46.17
2480 7635 27635 58894 03/1883 03/1949 66
2481 7636 27636 03/1883 12/1947 64.75
2482 7637 03/1883 03/1926 43
2483 7638 27638 03/1883 07/1934 51.33
2484 7639 27639 03/1883 11/1936 53.67
2485 7640 27640 03/1883 10/1947 64.58
2486 7641 03/1883 11/1932 49.67
2487 7642 03/1883 09/1932 49.5
2488 7643 04/1883 07/1934 51.25
2489 7644 04/1883 04/1926 43
2490 7555 27555 04/1883 01/1947 63.75
2491 7645 27645 04/1883 12/1945 62.67
2492 7646 04/1883 09/1926 43.42
952 7651 27651 07/1883 10/1938 55.25
953 7657 27657 07/1883 11/1936 53.33
617 7632 07/1883 11/1934 51.33
678 7653 07/1883 06/1927 43.92
518 3285 7566 07/1883 03/1928 44.67
694 7655 27655 07/1883 04/1937 53.75
692 7654 27654 58895 07/1883 10/1951 68.25
698 7656 07/1883 1932 48.42
780 7658 07/1883 04/1927 43.75
959 7659 27659 07/1883 11/1935 52.33
1004 7660 27660 07/1883 09/1938 55.17
42 3705 7662 27662 07/1883 07/1946 63
110 3709 7663 27663 07/1883 12/1947 64.42
148 3720 7664 27664 07/1883 12/1947 64.42
150 3722 7665 08/1883 03/1928 44.58
169 3728 7666 27666 08/1883 01/1947 63.42
178 08/1883 01/1920 36.42
179 3729 7667 08/1883 1931 47.33
223 3735 7668 27684 08/1883 1931 47.33
259 3753 7669 27669 58896 08/1883 01/1949 65.42
1106 7672 27672 10/1883 10/1947 64
1109 7673 10/1883 07/1928 44.75
324 3151 7675 11/1883 06/1927 43.58
848 7670 11/1883 05/1927 43.5
1101 7671 11/1883 07/1931 47.67
1112 7674 27674 58897 11/1883 10/1950 66.92 67.04
373 3339 7684 11/1883 11/1935 52
1118 7682 11/1883 06/1947 63.58
981 7680 27680 11/1883 01/1937 53.17
491 3005 7567 11/1883 03/1928 44.33
149 3721 7687 12/1883 1932 48
1013 7681 27681 58898 12/1883 02/10/1948 64.83 64.88
367 3029 7683 12/1883 04/1927 43.33
489 3448 7685 12/1883 10/1927 43.83
490 3457 7686 27686 12/1883 11/1935 51.92
492 3055 7557 12/1883 12/1930 47
925 7676 01/1884 10/1928 44.75
926 7677 01/1884 1932 47.92
927 7678 27678 01/1884 12/1945 61.92
928 7679 01/1884 1932 47.92
6 3336 7692 58899 04/1884 08/1954 70.33
8 3475 7693 04/1884 03/1928 43.92
23 3702 7694 04/1884 10/1927 43.5
30 3703 7695 04/1884 11/1928 44.58
32 3704 7696 04/1884 05/1932 48.08
1057 7690 07/1884 07/1947 63
948 7689 07/1884 07/1927 43
152 3723 7691 27691 09/1884 1935 50.25
751 7688 08/1884 04/1938 53.67
994 09/1884 07/1922 37.83
63 3706 7697 09/1884 04/1924 39.58
145 3719 7698 09/1884 08/1928 43.92
186 3724 7699 58900 09/1884 10/1954 70.08
161 3727 7700 09/1884 03/1948 63.5
258 3752 7701 09/1884 07/1927 42.83
1005 7705 10/1884 11/1946 62.08
947 7702 10/1884 07/1928 43.75
949 7703 58901 10/1884 07/1948 63.75 64.04
950 7704 10/1884 12/1930 46.17
483 3423 7706 10/1884 06/1928 43.67
484 12/1884 02/1920 35.17
652 7707 12/1884 12/1930 46
699 7708 12/1884 03/1928 43.25
771 7709 12/1884 06/1947 62.5
782 12/1884 11/1922 37.92
796 7710 58902 12/1884 31/12/1954 70
958 7558 27558 12/1884 01/1947 62.08
966 7711 58903 01/1885 19/06/1954 69.42
970 7712 01/1885 07/1938 53.5
1012 01/1885 07/1922 37.5
1016 7713 01/1885 11/1932 47.83
1075 7714 01/1885 06/1928 43.42
1201 7715 01/1885 01/1948 63
1202 7716 01/1885 09/1928 43.67
1203 7717 01/1885 11/1947 62.83
1204 7718 01/1885 1932 46.92
1206 7719 01/1885 1932 46.92
1207 7720 58904 01/1885 30/09/1955 70.67 70.71
1208 7721 58905 01/1885 28/08/1948 63.58 63.79
1209 7722 01/1885 01/1947 62
1210 7723 04/1886 04/1927 41
2360 7724 04/1886 08/1938 52.33
2361 7725 04/1886 11/1930 44.58
2362 7726 04/1885 09/1927 42.42
2363 7727 27727 04/1886 03/1936 49.92
2364 7728 04/1886 12/1938 52.67
2453 7729 04/1886 01/1944 57.75
2454 7730 58906 04/1886 13/11/1948 62.58
2455 7731 04/1886 06/1928 42.17
2456 7732 04/1886 05/1928 42.08
2457 7733 58907 04/1886 02/10/1948 62.5 62.54
355 3271 7735 07/1886 11/1928 42.33
357 3320 7736 27736 07/1886 05/1936 49.83
359 3325 7737 58908 07/1886 10/11/1951 65.33
240 3741 7741 58910 07/1886 05/07/1952 66
210 3453 7740 58909 07/1886 12/06/1948 61.92 62.04
369 3058 7734 27734 07/1886 09/1936 50.17
436 3415 7559 07/1886 1931 44.42
452 3422 7739 07/1886 1931 44.42
438 3418 7738 07/1886 12/1930 44.42
120 3711 7749 08/1886 01/1928 41.42
261 3754 7756 58914 08/1886 28/08/1948 62 62.13
266 3755 7757 58915 08/1886 30/09/1954 68.08 68.30
215 3731 7751 58912 08/1886 16/12/1950 64.33 64.46
293 3105 7744 08/1886 1931 44.33
296 3109 7745 08/1886 04/1927 40.67
192 3068 7743 08/1886 12/1930 44.33
211 3509 7748 08/1886 07/1931 44.92
220 3733 7753 08/1886 10/1927 41.17
440 3419 7747 08/1886 09/1947 61.08
221 3734 7754 08/1886 04/1927 40.67
237 3739 7755 08/1886 09/1947 61.08
123 3712 7750 27750 08/1886 03/1936 49.58
183 3044 7742 08/1886 10/1947 61.17
216 3732 7752 58913 08/1885 06/1952 66.83
407 3353 7746 58911 08/1886 31/03/1954 67.58
1338 7762 12/1886 01/1935 48.08
2010 7763 12/1886 04/1946 59.33
442 3420 7560 12/1886 05/1928 41.42
429 3414 7764 12/1886 02/1939 52.17
411 3356 7758 12/1886 1932 45
417 3387 7759 58916 12/1886 07/10/1950 63.83
224 3736 7761 12/1886 03/1946 59.25
549 3287 7550 12/1886 07/1931 44.58
551 3428 7760 12/1886 12/1930 44
554 3447 7767 02/1887 06/1927 40.33
557 3765 7768 02/1887 12/1944 57.83
558 3766 7769 58918 02/1887 24/04/1948 61.17
579 7766 02/1887 06/1927 40.33
567 3767 7770 02/1887 02/1936 49
568 3768 7771 02/1887 1928 40.83
569 3769 7772 02/1887 04/1947 60.17
570 3770 7773 58919 02/1887 20/12/1952 65.83 66.29
571 3771 7774 02/1887 03/1936 49.08
572 3772 7775 02/1887 11/1930 43.75
573 3773 7776 02/1887 12/1924 37.83
974 3774 7777 02/1887 09/1930 43.58
575 3775 7778 02/1887 09/1946 59.58
576 3776 7561 27561 58881 02/1887 09/1950 63.58 63.62
578 7765 58917 02/1887 02/1950 63
129 3714 7787 58922 05/1887 07/1948 61.17 61.38
443 3421 7785 05/1887 1932 44.58
135 3715 7788 05/1887 1931 43.58
580 7779 05/1887 04/1932 44.92
582 7780 58920 05/1887 14/08/1948 61.25
584 7781 05/1887 1934 46.58
585 7782 58921 05/1887 21/08/1954 67.25
435 3155 7562 27562 58882 05/1887 10/1949 62.42
125 3713 7786 05/1887 04/1927 39.92
588 7783 05/1887 1932 44.58
589 7784 05/1887 01/1936 48.67
590 7789 58923 06/1887 01/1950 62.58
591 7790 06/1887 12/1930 43.5
592 7791 58924 06/1887 30/09/1954 67.25 67.38
594 7792 06/1887 11/1937 50.42
595 7793 06/1887 1932 44.5
596 7794 58925 06/1887 30/09/1955 68.25 68.30
597 7563 27563 06/1887 10/1934 47.33
493 3062 27795 06/1887 01/1947 59.58
325 3209 7796 07/1887 02/1948 60.58
706 7797 06/1888 12/1945 57.5
753 7798 07/1888 05/1927 38.83
1053 7661 09/1888 09/1928 40
1054 7799 58926 09/1888 31/10/1958 70.08 Prs Preserved
1062 7800 09/1888 10/1927 39.08
1063 7801 09/1888 1932 43.25
1067 7802 58927 09/1888 10/1949 61.08
1068 7803 58928 09/1888 27/01/1951 62.33 62.37
1069 7804 09/1888 10/1934 46.08
1076 7805 09/1888 1931 42.25
1031 7806 09/1888 03/1936 47.5
1046 7807 12/1888 01/1946 57.08
1048 7808 58929 12/1888 03/1950 61.25
1049 7809 12/1888 08/1928 39.67
1050 7810 12/1888 04/1927 38.33
1052 7811 12/1888 1934 45
1077 7812 12/1888 01/1946 57.08
1078 7813 12/1888 08/1932 43.67
1079 7814 12/1888 12/1934 46
1080 7815 12/1888 11/1928 39.92
1250 7816 58930 07/1892 18/09/1948 56.17 56.21
1251 7817 07/1892 11/1926 34.33
1252 7818 07/1892 10/1934 42.25
1253 7819 07/1892 04/1927 34.75
1254 7820 07/1892 10/1934 42.25
1255 7821 58931 07/1892 27/03/1948 55.67 55.87
1256 7822 58932 07/1892 06/1952 59.92
1257 07/1892 01/1920 27.5
1258 7823 07/1892 06/1947 54.92
1259 7824 07/1892 05/1945 52.83
331 3231 7828 10/1896 10/1928 32
1198 7826 10/1896 1932 35.17
1199 7564 10/1896 1931 34.17
1200 7827 10/1896 04/1946 49.5
10 3498 7829 58933 10/1896 15/12/1951 55.17
11 3669 7830 27830 58934 10/1896 10/1949 53 53.12
709 7825 10/1896 12/1927 31.17
13 3670 7831 10/1896 07/1935 38.75
15 3701 7832 11/1896 10/1927 30.92
69 11/1896 01/1920 23.17
2350 7833 58935 02/1897 10/1951 54.67
2351 7834 02/1897 10/1947 50.67
2352 7835 02/1897 03/1936 39.08
2353 7836 58936 02/1897 22/05/1948 51.25
2354 7837 02/1897 05/1927 30.25
2355 7838 02/1897 11/1938 41.75
2356 7565 02/1897 12/1930 33.83
2357 7839 02/1897 02/1928 31
2358 7840 58937 02/1897 24/04/1948 51.17 51.61
180 7841 02/1897 02/1948 51