Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 441 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 441 Week
» 27062 Month
» 27062 Year
» 1692438 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

SDJR/LMS Fowler "SDJ7F" Class 2-8-0


S&DJR LMS (1st) LMS (2nd) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
80 9670 13800 53800 02/1914 19/06/1959 Bath Green Park (S&D) 45.33 45.69
81 9671 13801 53801 03/1914 19/06/1961 47.25 47.54
82 9672 13802 53802 03/1914 08/03/1960 46 46.20
83 9673 13803 53803 04/1914 08/02/1962 47.83 47.87
84 9674 13804 53804 04/1914 08/02/1962 47.83 47.87
85 9675 13805 53805 08/1914 21/03/1961 46.58 46.70
86 9676 13806 53806 07/1925 22/01/1964 38.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1964 39.03
87 9677 13807 53807 07/1925 07/09/1964 39.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 39.69
88 9678 13808 53808 07/1925 26/02/1964 38.58 Prs Preserved
89 9679 13809 53809 07/1925 01/06/1964 38.92 Prs Preserved
90 9680 13810 53810 08/1925 18/11/1963 38.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1964 38.53