Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 4907 Today
» 4610 Yesterday
» 4907 Week
» 83842 Month
» 563068 Year
» 3589921 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

LTSR/LMS Whitelegg "37" Class 4-4-2T


LTSR MR LMS (1929) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
37 2146 2135 41953 03/1897 25/08/1951 54.42 54.54
38 2147 2136 41954 04/1897 25/08/1951 54.33 54.37
39 2148 2137 41955 04/1897 12/02/1951 53.83 53.87
40 2149 2138 41956 04/1897 28/09/1951 54.42 54.53
41 2150 2139 41957 04/1897 28/09/1951 54.42 54.53
42 2151 2140 41958 04/1897 22/12/1951 54.67 54.79
43 2152 2141 41959 12/1898 28/09/1951 52.75
44 2153 2142 41960 12/1898 12/02/1951 52.17 52.20
45 2154 2143 41961 12/1898 18/10/1952 53.83 53.87
46 2155 2144 41962 12/1898 02/1951 52.17 52.20
47 2156 2145 41963 01/1899 21/02/1951 52.08 52.19
48 2157 2146 41964 01/1899 12/02/1951 52.08 52.19