LNER (1943) |
LNER (1946) |
BR (BR Tmp) |
BR |
DP (Dept) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
Name |
8301
|
1000
|
|
61000
|
|
12/12/1942 |
Darlington |
05/03/1962 |
Colwick |
19.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/1962 |
19.27 |
SPRINGBOK |
8302
|
1001
|
|
61001
|
|
12/06/1943 |
Darlington |
22/09/1963 |
Doncaster |
20.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
10/1963 |
20.36 |
ELAND |
8303
|
1002
|
|
61002
|
|
21/09/1943 |
Darlington |
24/06/1967 |
Hull Dairycoates |
23.75 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
08/1967 |
23.92 |
IMPALA |
8304
|
1003
|
|
61003
|
|
22/11/1943 |
Darlington |
26/12/1965 |
Colwick |
22.08 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
02/1966 |
22.25 |
GAZELLE |
8305
|
1004
|
|
61004
|
|
22/12/1943 |
Darlington |
28/12/1963 |
Canklow |
20 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
21/03/1964 |
20.26 |
ORYX |
8306
|
1005
|
|
61005
|
|
19/02/1944 |
Darlington |
16/09/1962 |
March |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
21/11/1962 |
18.77 |
BONGO |
8307
|
1006
|
|
61006
|
|
17/03/1944 |
Darlington |
22/09/1963 |
Lincoln |
19.5 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
01/1964 |
19.84 |
BLACKBUCK |
8308
|
1007
|
|
61007
|
|
14/04/1944 |
Darlington |
06/02/1964 |
Ayr |
19.83 |
|
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
06/1964 |
20.18 |
KLIPSPRINGER |
8309
|
1008
|
|
61008
|
|
13/05/1944 |
Darlington |
09/12/1966 |
Carstairs |
22.58 |
|
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
02/1967 |
22.78 |
KUDU |
8310
|
1009
|
|
61009
|
|
19/06/1944 |
Darlington |
16/09/1962 |
Lincoln |
18.25 |
|
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
05/1964 |
19.92 |
HARTEBEESTE |
|
1010
|
|
61010
|
|
02/11/1946 |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
07/11/1965 |
Hull Dairycoates |
19 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
28/02/1966 |
19.34 |
WILDEBEESTE |
|
1011
|
|
61011
|
|
30/11/1946 |
Gateshead |
02/11/1962 |
Gorton |
16 |
623,683 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
27/11/1962 |
16.00 |
WATERBUCK |
|
1012
|
|
61012
|
|
30/11/1946 |
Gateshead |
12/06/1967 |
York (North) |
20.58 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
08/1967 |
20.72 |
PUKU |
|
1013
|
|
61013
|
|
14/12/1946 |
Gateshead |
06/12/1966 |
Wakefield |
20 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1967 |
20.19 |
TOPI |
|
1014
|
|
61014
|
|
23/12/1946 |
Gateshead |
31/12/1966 |
Blyth (North) |
20 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
03/1967 |
20.24 |
ORIBI |
|
1015
|
|
61015
|
|
04/01/1947 |
York (North) |
19/11/1962 |
Wakefield |
15.83 |
495,202 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1963 |
16.04 |
DUIKER |
|
1016
|
|
61016
|
|
16/01/1947 |
York (North) |
31/10/1965 |
Low Moor |
18.75 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
18.93 |
INYALA |
|
1017
|
|
61017
|
|
28/01/1947 |
York (North) |
15/11/1966 |
York (North) |
19.83 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1967 |
19.98 |
BUSHBUCK |
|
1018
|
|
61018
|
|
04/02/1947 |
York (North) |
07/11/1965 |
York (North) |
18.75 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
18.87 |
GNU |
|
1019
|
|
61019
|
|
24/02/1947 |
Heaton |
12/03/1967 |
York (North) |
20.08 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1967 |
20.40 |
NILGHAI |
|
1020
|
|
61020
|
|
28/02/1947 |
Heaton |
26/11/1962 |
York (North) |
15.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1963 |
15.89 |
GEMSBOK |
|
1021
|
|
61021
|
|
12/03/1947 |
Heaton |
06/06/1967 |
York (North) |
20.25 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
08/1967 |
20.44 |
REITBOK |
|
1022
|
|
61022
|
|
22/03/1947 |
Heaton |
25/11/1966 |
Wakefield |
19.67 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
02/1967 |
19.92 |
SASSABY |
|
1023
|
|
61023
|
|
01/04/1947 |
Heaton |
31/10/1965 |
Low Moor |
18.5 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
18.72 |
HIROLA |
|
1024
|
|
61024
|
|
12/04/1947 |
Tweedmouth |
15/05/1966 |
Wakefield |
19.08 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
07/1966 |
19.27 |
ADDAX |
|
1025
|
|
61025
|
|
22/04/1947 |
Tweedmouth |
02/12/1962 |
Alnmouth |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1963 |
15.91 |
PALLAH |
|
1026
|
|
61026
|
|
28/04/1947 |
Doncaster |
10/02/1966 |
Immingham |
18.83 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
18.89 |
OUREBI |
|
1027
|
|
61027
|
|
11/05/1947 |
New England |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.85 |
MADOQUA |
|
1028
|
|
61028
|
|
30/05/1947 |
Neasden |
08/10/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.42 |
646,550 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
22/03/1963 |
15.82 |
UMSEKE |
|
1029
|
|
61029
|
|
07/06/1947 |
Kings Cross |
31/12/1966 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
19.5 |
|
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
02/1967 |
19.71 |
CHAMOIS |
|
1030
|
|
61030
|
|
26/06/1947 |
Stockton |
30/09/1967 |
Low Moor |
20.25 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
11/1967 |
20.40 |
NYALA |
|
1031
|
|
61031
|
|
10/07/1947 |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
09/11/1964 |
Ardsley |
17.33 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1965 |
17.53 |
REEDBUCK |
|
1032
|
|
61032
|
|
07/08/1947 |
Stockton |
27/11/1966 |
Hull Dairycoates |
19.25 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1967 |
19.54 |
STEMBOK |
|
1033
|
|
61033
|
|
29/08/1947 |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
25/03/1963 |
Canklow |
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
25/03/1963 |
15.58 |
DIBATAG |
|
1034
|
|
61034
|
|
03/10/1947 |
York (North) |
21/12/1964 |
Wakefield |
17.17 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1965 |
17.38 |
CHIRU |
|
1035
|
|
61035
|
|
31/10/1947 |
York (North) |
12/12/1966 |
York (North) |
19.17 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1967 |
19.31 |
PRONGHORN |
|
1036
|
|
61036
|
|
20/11/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Doncaster |
14.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
01/11/1962 |
14.96 |
RALPH ASSHETON |
|
1037
|
|
61037
|
|
28/11/1947 |
Darlington |
18/05/1964 |
Darlington |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
08/1964 |
16.73 |
JAIROU |
|
1038
|
|
61038
|
|
05/12/1947 |
Darlington |
01/05/1964 |
Gateshead |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
09/1964 |
16.79 |
BLACKTAIL |
|
1039
|
|
61039
|
|
12/12/1947 |
Darlington |
27/06/1965 |
Doncaster |
17.5 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
17.69 |
|
|
1040
|
|
61040
|
|
16/04/1946 |
Stratford |
10/07/1966 |
Wakefield |
20.25 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
08/1966 |
20.35 |
|
|
1041
|
|
61041
|
|
26/04/1946 |
Stratford |
19/04/1964 |
New England |
18 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
18.15 |
|
|
1042
|
|
61042
|
|
04/05/1946 |
Cambridge |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
19.92 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
05/1966 |
20.04 |
|
|
1043
|
|
61043
|
|
14/05/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
09/07/1962 |
March |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1962 |
16.18 |
|
|
1044
|
|
61044
|
|
20/05/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
17/03/1964 |
Canklow |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
05/1964 |
18.00 |
|
|
1045
|
E1045
|
61045
|
|
24/05/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
16.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
26/11/1962 |
16.52 |
|
|
1046
|
E1046
|
61046
|
|
29/05/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
24/04/1962 |
Cambridge |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
04/1962 |
15.89 |
|
|
1047
|
|
61047
|
|
03/06/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
16.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
16.79 |
|
|
1048
|
|
61048
|
|
06/06/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
16.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/12/1962 |
16.50 |
|
|
1049
|
|
61049
|
|
11/06/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
07/11/1965 |
York (North) |
19.42 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
19.53 |
|
|
1050
|
|
61050
|
30
|
17/06/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
10/02/1966 |
Shirebrook |
19.67 |
|
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
10/1968 |
22.35 |
|
|
1051
|
E1051
|
61051
|
31
|
20/06/1946 |
Norwich Thorpe |
10/02/1966 |
Shirebrook |
19.67 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
05/1966 |
19.92 |
|
|
1052
|
|
61052
|
|
24/06/1946 |
Ipswich |
16/09/1962 |
March |
16.25 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
16.99 |
|
|
1053
|
|
61053
|
|
27/06/1946 |
Ipswich |
25/02/1963 |
York (North) |
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
13/03/1963 |
16.72 |
|
|
1054
|
|
61054
|
|
02/07/1946 |
Ipswich |
16/09/1962 |
March |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
16.96 |
|
|
1055
|
|
61055
|
|
04/07/1946 |
Ipswich |
27/02/1966 |
Doncaster |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
04/1966 |
19.79 |
|
|
1056
|
E1056
|
61056
|
|
04/07/1946 |
Ipswich |
19/04/1964 |
Immingham |
17.75 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
17.96 |
|
|
1057
|
|
61057
|
|
08/07/1946 |
Ipswich |
17/04/1950 |
Ipswich |
3.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stratford) |
04/1950 |
3.77 |
|
|
1058
|
|
61058
|
|
10/07/1946 |
Ipswich |
10/02/1966 |
Immingham |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
19.69 |
|
|
1059
|
|
61059
|
17
|
27/07/1946 |
Ipswich |
25/11/1963 |
March |
17.33 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
05/1966 |
19.81 |
|
|
1060
|
|
61060
|
|
01/08/1946 |
Neville Hill |
16/09/1962 |
Lincoln |
16.08 |
|
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
01/1963 |
16.47 |
|
|
1061
|
|
61061
|
|
03/08/1946 |
Perth (LNER) |
13/09/1965 |
Ardsley |
19.08 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
10/1965 |
19.21 |
|
|
1062
|
|
61062
|
|
07/08/1946 |
Neville Hill |
03/08/1964 |
York (North) |
18 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
08/09/1964 |
18.10 |
|
|
1063
|
|
61063
|
|
10/08/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
26/03/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
13/04/1962 |
15.68 |
|
|
1064
|
E1064
|
61064
|
|
14/08/1946 |
Kittybrewster |
15/10/1962 |
Carlisle Canal |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
07/1963 |
16.93 |
|
|
1065
|
|
61065
|
|
15/08/1946 |
Neville Hill |
01/09/1964 |
Hull Dairycoates |
18.08 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
11/1964 |
18.27 |
|
|
1066
|
E1066
|
61066
|
|
19/08/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
16/09/1962 |
March |
16.08 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
16.83 |
|
|
1067
|
|
61067
|
|
22/08/1946 |
Kittybrewster |
29/12/1962 |
Parkhead |
16.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
01/1963 |
16.41 |
|
|
1068
|
E1068
|
61068
|
|
23/08/1946 |
Neville Hill |
17/06/1963 |
Ardsley |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/07/1963 |
16.87 |
|
|
1069
|
E1069
|
61069
|
|
26/08/1946 |
Neville Hill |
26/08/1963 |
York (North) |
17 |
701,531 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1963 |
17.07 |
|
|
1070
|
|
61070
|
|
28/08/1946 |
Eastfield |
22/08/1965 |
Colwick |
19 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
09/1965 |
19.06 |
|
|
1071
|
|
61071
|
|
29/08/1946 |
Eastfield |
11/02/1963 |
York (North) |
16.5 |
528,179 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
11/03/1963 |
16.54 |
|
|
1072
|
E1072
|
61072
|
|
07/09/1946 |
Eastfield |
01/05/1967 |
Dundee West |
20.67 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
14/07/1967 |
20.86 |
|
|
1073
|
E1073
|
61073
|
|
06/09/1946 |
Eastfield |
22/09/1963 |
New England |
17 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
02/1964 |
17.45 |
|
|
1074
|
|
61074
|
|
07/09/1946 |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
04/09/1963 |
New England |
17 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
01/1964 |
17.37 |
|
|
1075
|
|
61075
|
|
16/09/1946 |
Gorton |
22/09/1963 |
Mexborough |
17 |
|
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
12/1963 |
17.26 |
|
|
1076
|
|
61076
|
|
17/09/1946 |
Haymarket |
10/09/1965 |
St Margarets |
19 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
11/1965 |
19.18 |
|
|
1077
|
|
61077
|
|
18/09/1946 |
Gorton |
14/05/1962 |
Gorton |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
21/06/1962 |
15.77 |
|
|
1078
|
|
61078
|
|
23/09/1946 |
Gorton |
08/10/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
16.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
22/03/1963 |
16.50 |
|
|
1079
|
|
61079
|
|
24/09/1946 |
Gorton |
18/06/1962 |
Immingham |
15.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
06/1962 |
15.73 |
|
|
1080
|
|
61080
|
|
26/09/1946 |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
30/03/1964 |
Hull Dairycoates |
17.5 |
|
Cut |
Butlers (Otley) |
05/1964 |
17.65 |
|
|
1081
|
|
61081
|
|
03/10/1946 |
Haymarket |
29/06/1964 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
17.67 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
08/1964 |
17.88 |
|
|
1082
|
|
61082
|
|
04/10/1946 |
Gorton |
29/12/1962 |
Immingham |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1963 |
16.38 |
|
|
1083
|
|
61083
|
|
07/10/1946 |
Gorton |
22/09/1963 |
Canklow |
16.92 |
|
Cut |
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
12/1963 |
17.20 |
|
|
1084
|
|
61084
|
|
09/10/1946 |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
29/06/1964 |
York (North) |
17.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
07/09/1964 |
17.93 |
|
|
1085
|
|
61085
|
|
11/10/1946 |
Gorton |
27/11/1961 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
07/12/1961 |
15.17 |
|
|
1086
|
|
61086
|
|
14/10/1946 |
Gorton |
03/12/1962 |
York (North) |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
18/12/1962 |
16.19 |
|
|
1087
|
|
61087
|
|
16/10/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
05/12/1965 |
Doncaster |
19.17 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
01/1966 |
19.26 |
|
|
1088
|
|
61088
|
|
18/10/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
22/09/1963 |
Colwick |
16.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1964 |
17.25 |
|
|
1089
|
|
61089
|
|
22/10/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
02/04/1966 |
Colwick |
19.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
05/1966 |
19.58 |
|
|
1090
|
|
61090
|
|
24/10/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
22/09/1963 |
Mexborough |
16.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
22/09/1963 |
16.92 |
|
|
1091
|
|
61091
|
|
28/10/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
10/09/1962 |
New England |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
09/1962 |
15.89 |
|
|
1092
|
|
61092
|
|
30/10/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
19/02/1966 |
Colwick |
19.33 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
05/1966 |
19.55 |
|
|
1093
|
|
61093
|
|
04/11/1946 |
Doncaster |
25/07/1965 |
Langwith Junction |
18.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
09/1965 |
18.88 |
|
|
1094
|
E1094
|
61094
|
|
06/11/1946 |
Doncaster |
20/06/1965 |
Colwick |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Broughton Lane, Sheffield) |
08/1965 |
18.79 |
|
|
1095
|
|
61095
|
|
11/11/1946 |
Doncaster |
28/12/1963 |
Lincoln |
17.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
01/1964 |
17.19 |
|
|
1096
|
|
61096
|
|
12/11/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
16/09/1962 |
March |
15.83 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
16.60 |
|
|
1097
|
|
61097
|
|
15/11/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
03/01/1965 |
New England |
18.17 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
02/1965 |
18.27 |
|
|
1098
|
|
61098
|
|
19/11/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
11/07/1965 |
Immingham |
18.67 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
08/1965 |
18.75 |
|
|
1099
|
|
61099
|
|
21/11/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
02/09/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
19.83 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
10/1966 |
19.91 |
|
|
1100
|
E1100
|
61100
|
|
26/11/1946 |
Gateshead |
19/11/1962 |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
16 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
21/02/1963 |
16.25 |
|
|
1101
|
|
61101
|
|
28/11/1946 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
31/12/1966 |
|
20.08 |
|
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
27/02/1967 |
20.26 |
|
|
1102
|
|
61102
|
|
02/12/1946 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
22/04/1967 |
Dundee West |
20.33 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
07/07/1967 |
20.61 |
|
|
1103
|
|
61103
|
|
04/12/1946 |
Thornton Junction |
14/07/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
09/1966 |
19.79 |
|
|
1104
|
|
61104
|
|
06/12/1946 |
Stratford |
18/04/1964 |
Canklow |
17.33 |
|
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
06/1964 |
17.54 |
|
|
1105
|
|
61105
|
27
|
09/12/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
26/12/1964 |
New England |
18 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
07/1966 |
19.61 |
|
|
1106
|
|
61106
|
|
11/12/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
02/11/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
27/11/1962 |
15.97 |
|
|
1107
|
|
61107
|
|
13/12/1946 |
Hitchin (GNR) |
15/08/1965 |
Doncaster |
18.67 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
09/1965 |
18.77 |
|
|
1108
|
|
61108
|
|
16/12/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
29/12/1962 |
St Margarets |
16 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
01/1963 |
16.09 |
|
|
1109
|
|
61109
|
|
18/12/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
12/07/1964 |
New England |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
08/1964 |
17.67 |
|
|
1110
|
|
61110
|
|
20/12/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
31/10/1965 |
Ardsley |
18.83 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
19.00 |
|
|
1111
|
|
61111
|
|
24/12/1946 |
Sheffield Darnall |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.75 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
16.23 |
|
|
1112
|
|
61112
|
|
27/12/1946 |
Kings Cross |
29/12/1962 |
Mexborough |
16 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1963 |
16.48 |
|
|
1113
|
|
61113
|
|
31/12/1946 |
Kings Cross |
22/09/1963 |
Lincoln |
16.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
17/09/1963 |
16.72 |
|
|
1114
|
|
61114
|
|
08/01/1947 |
Kings Cross |
16/09/1962 |
Immingham |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
01/1963 |
16.03 |
|
|
1115
|
|
61115
|
|
10/01/1947 |
York (North) |
08/05/1967 |
Wakefield |
20.33 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
21/07/1967 |
20.54 |
|
|
1116
|
|
61116
|
|
13/01/1947 |
Eastfield |
17/07/1966 |
Carstairs |
19.5 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1966 |
19.77 |
|
|
1117
|
|
61117
|
|
15/01/1947 |
Eastfield |
06/02/1964 |
St Margarets |
17.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
02/1964 |
17.10 |
|
|
1118
|
|
61118
|
|
17/01/1947 |
Thornton Junction |
23/07/1964 |
Thornton Junction |
17.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/1964 |
17.76 |
|
|
1119
|
|
61119
|
|
20/01/1947 |
Stratford |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
14/01/1964 |
16.99 |
|
|
1120
|
|
61120
|
|
22/01/1947 |
Doncaster |
31/01/1965 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
18 |
|
Cut |
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
03/1965 |
18.16 |
|
|
1121
|
|
61121
|
|
24/01/1947 |
Kings Cross |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
19.25 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
05/1966 |
19.32 |
|
|
1122
|
|
61122
|
|
28/01/1947 |
Sheffield Darnall |
25/11/1963 |
New England |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
30/01/1964 |
17.02 |
|
|
1123
|
|
61123
|
|
30/01/1947 |
Sheffield Darnall |
11/05/1967 |
York (North) |
20.33 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
21/07/1967 |
20.48 |
|
|
1124
|
|
61124
|
|
04/02/1947 |
Doncaster |
16/09/1962 |
Doncaster |
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
01/11/1962 |
15.75 |
|
|
1125
|
|
61125
|
|
06/02/1947 |
Doncaster |
28/12/1963 |
Doncaster |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
08/01/1964 |
16.93 |
|
|
1126
|
|
61126
|
|
07/02/1947 |
Doncaster |
22/09/1963 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
16.58 |
|
Cut |
Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) |
01/1964 |
16.95 |
|
|
1127
|
|
61127
|
|
12/02/1947 |
Doncaster |
15/08/1965 |
Frodingham |
18.5 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
28/12/1965 |
18.89 |
|
|
1128
|
|
61128
|
|
14/02/1947 |
Sheffield Darnall |
29/12/1962 |
Doncaster |
15.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1963 |
16.34 |
|
|
1129
|
|
61129
|
|
18/02/1947 |
Kings Cross |
13/09/1965 |
Wakefield |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
10/1965 |
18.67 |
|
|
1130
|
|
61130
|
|
24/02/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Immingham |
15.58 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Broughton Lane, Sheffield) |
01/1963 |
15.90 |
|
|
1131
|
|
61131
|
|
25/02/1947 |
Gorton |
06/12/1966 |
Wakefield |
19.83 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
16/02/1967 |
19.99 |
|
|
1132
|
|
61132
|
|
26/02/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
02/09/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
10/1966 |
19.65 |
|
|
1133
|
|
61133
|
|
28/02/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
02/09/1966 |
|
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
10/1966 |
19.64 |
|
|
1134
|
|
61134
|
|
04/03/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
05/10/1965 |
Dalry Road |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
11/1965 |
18.72 |
|
|
1135
|
|
61135
|
|
10/03/1947 |
Stratford |
22/09/1963 |
Doncaster |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
30/10/1963 |
16.65 |
|
|
1136
|
|
61136
|
|
18/03/1947 |
Gorton |
22/10/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
22/11/1962 |
15.69 |
|
|
1137
|
|
61137
|
|
19/03/1947 |
Gorton |
28/05/1962 |
Gorton |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
17/08/1962 |
15.42 |
|
|
1138
|
|
61138
|
26
|
31/03/1947 |
Gorton |
03/01/1965 |
New England |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1967 |
20.64 |
|
|
1139
|
|
61139
|
|
01/04/1947 |
Sheffield Darnall |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.96 |
|
|
1140
|
|
61140
|
|
11/04/1947 |
Gorton |
31/12/1966 |
Motherwell |
19.67 |
|
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
02/1967 |
19.86 |
|
|
1141
|
|
61141
|
|
11/04/1947 |
Gorton |
25/07/1965 |
Colwick |
18.25 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
09/1965 |
18.44 |
|
|
1142
|
|
61142
|
|
15/04/1947 |
Gorton |
22/09/1963 |
Colwick |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1963 |
16.68 |
|
|
1143
|
|
61143
|
|
15/04/1947 |
Gorton |
24/02/1964 |
Immingham |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
13/03/1964 |
16.92 |
|
|
1144
|
|
61144
|
|
17/04/1947 |
Gorton |
19/04/1964 |
Immingham |
17 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
17.18 |
|
|
1145
|
|
61145
|
|
17/04/1947 |
Gorton |
02/01/1966 |
Colwick |
18.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
03/1966 |
18.92 |
|
|
1146
|
|
61146
|
|
22/04/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
12/03/1964 |
Thornton Junction |
16.92 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Inverkeithing) |
06/1964 |
17.16 |
|
|
1147
|
|
61147
|
|
22/04/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
16/12/1965 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
18.67 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
01/1966 |
18.75 |
|
|
1148
|
|
61148
|
|
25/04/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
02/09/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
19.42 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
11/1966 |
19.57 |
|
|
1149
|
|
61149
|
|
25/04/1947 |
Stratford |
23/09/1962 |
March |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
16.15 |
|
|
1150
|
|
61150
|
|
29/04/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.89 |
|
|
1151
|
|
61151
|
|
29/04/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.89 |
|
|
1152
|
|
61152
|
|
02/05/1947 |
Gorton |
19/04/1964 |
Immingham |
16.92 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
17.13 |
|
|
1153
|
|
61153
|
|
02/05/1947 |
Gorton |
17/01/1965 |
Canklow |
17.67 |
|
Cut |
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
03/1965 |
17.88 |
|
|
1154
|
|
61154
|
|
06/05/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.87 |
|
|
1155
|
|
61155
|
|
06/05/1947 |
Gorton |
01/03/1964 |
Mexborough |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
05/1964 |
17.04 |
|
|
1156
|
|
61156
|
|
09/05/1947 |
Gorton |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
13/01/1964 |
16.69 |
|
|
1157
|
|
61157
|
|
09/05/1947 |
Gorton |
01/08/1965 |
Doncaster |
18.25 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
09/1965 |
18.37 |
|
|
1158
|
|
61158
|
|
14/05/1947 |
Gorton |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
18.92 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
05/1966 |
19.02 |
|
|
1159
|
|
61159
|
|
14/05/1947 |
Gorton |
22/09/1963 |
Immingham |
16.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1963 |
16.52 |
|
|
1160
|
|
61160
|
|
16/05/1947 |
Gorton |
22/09/1963 |
Colwick |
16.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1964 |
16.68 |
|
|
1161
|
|
61161
|
|
16/05/1947 |
Gorton |
06/12/1966 |
Wakefield |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
02/1967 |
19.77 |
|
|
1162
|
|
61162
|
|
21/05/1947 |
Gorton |
08/12/1964 |
New England |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
02/1965 |
17.75 |
|
|
1163
|
|
61163
|
|
23/05/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Colwick |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
02/1963 |
15.75 |
|
|
1164
|
|
61164
|
|
23/05/1947 |
Gorton |
10/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
09/1962 |
15.33 |
|
|
1165
|
|
61165
|
|
28/05/1947 |
Gorton |
01/11/1964 |
Canklow |
17.5 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1965 |
17.65 |
|
|
1166
|
|
61166
|
|
30/05/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
05/1963 |
15.97 |
|
|
1167
|
|
61167
|
|
30/05/1947 |
Gorton |
06/12/1964 |
Canklow |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
02/1965 |
17.73 |
|
|
1168
|
|
61168
|
|
04/06/1947 |
Gorton |
03/10/1965 |
Immingham |
18.33 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1965 |
18.46 |
|
|
1169
|
|
61169
|
|
06/06/1947 |
Gorton |
28/12/1963 |
Mexborough |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
17/02/1964 |
16.71 |
|
|
1170
|
|
61170
|
|
06/06/1947 |
Gorton |
09/07/1962 |
Doncaster |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1962 |
15.12 |
|
|
1171
|
|
61171
|
|
11/06/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
March |
15.25 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
16.02 |
|
|
1172
|
|
61172
|
|
09/06/1947 |
Gorton |
16/12/1965 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
18.5 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
01/1966 |
18.62 |
|
|
1173
|
|
61173
|
|
09/06/1947 |
Gorton |
23/01/1967 |
York (North) |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
03/1967 |
19.78 |
|
|
1174
|
|
61174
|
|
18/06/1947 |
Gorton |
28/12/1963 |
New England |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
02/1964 |
16.67 |
|
|
1175
|
|
61175
|
|
18/06/1947 |
Gorton |
28/12/1963 |
Colwick |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
11/02/1964 |
16.66 |
|
|
1176
|
|
61176
|
|
17/06/1947 |
Darlington |
07/11/1965 |
York (North) |
18.42 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
18.51 |
|
|
1177
|
|
61177
|
|
25/06/1947 |
Gorton |
22/09/1963 |
Colwick |
16.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1963 |
16.48 |
|
|
1178
|
|
61178
|
|
23/06/1947 |
Haymarket |
13/02/1964 |
St Margarets |
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
05/1964 |
16.91 |
|
|
1179
|
|
61179
|
|
27/06/1947 |
Gorton |
10/01/1965 |
Immingham |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
02/1965 |
17.65 |
|
|
1180
|
|
61180
|
|
30/06/1947 |
Eastfield |
01/05/1967 |
Dundee West |
19.92 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
07/1967 |
20.05 |
|
|
1181
|
|
61181
|
18
|
02/07/1947 |
Gorton |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16.33 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
12/1965 |
18.47 |
|
|
1182
|
|
61182
|
|
04/07/1947 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
March |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
02/1963 |
15.63 |
|
|
1183
|
|
61183
|
|
09/07/1947 |
Gorton |
09/07/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1962 |
15.03 |
|
|
1184
|
|
61184
|
|
09/07/1947 |
Gorton |
29/12/1962 |
St Margarets |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
02/1963 |
15.62 |
|
|
1185
|
|
61185
|
|
09/07/1947 |
Gorton |
11/10/1964 |
Immingham |
17.25 |
|
Cut |
W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield) |
12/1964 |
17.45 |
|
|
1186
|
|
61186
|
|
16/07/1947 |
Gorton |
05/11/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
12/12/1962 |
15.42 |
|
|
1187
|
|
61187
|
|
29/07/1947 |
Gorton |
03/09/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
19/09/1962 |
15.15 |
|
|
1188
|
|
61188
|
|
29/07/1947 |
Gorton |
14/11/1965 |
Colwick |
18.33 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
18.39 |
|
|
1189
|
|
61189
|
|
08/08/1947 |
Stockton |
11/05/1967 |
York (North) |
19.75 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
07/1967 |
19.95 |
SIR WILLIAM GRAY |
|
1190
|
|
61190
|
|
08/05/1947 |
Doncaster |
20/06/1965 |
Colwick |
18.08 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
18.28 |
|
|
1191
|
|
61191
|
|
13/05/1947 |
Doncaster |
21/08/1965 |
St Margarets |
18.25 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1965 |
18.44 |
|
|
1192
|
|
61192
|
|
16/05/1947 |
Doncaster |
08/10/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
22/03/1963 |
15.86 |
|
|
1193
|
|
61193
|
|
19/05/1947 |
Doncaster |
16/09/1962 |
Doncaster |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
01/11/1962 |
15.47 |
|
|
1194
|
|
61194
|
28
|
21/05/1947 |
Doncaster |
29/08/1965 |
Colwick |
18.25 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
08/1966 |
19.25 |
|
|
1195
|
|
61195
|
|
24/05/1947 |
Immingham |
14/11/1965 |
Frodingham |
18.5 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
18.58 |
|
|
1196
|
|
61196
|
|
27/05/1947 |
Doncaster |
26/09/1965 |
Doncaster |
18.33 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
18.48 |
|
|
1197
|
|
61197
|
|
29/05/1947 |
Eastfield |
08/06/1964 |
Ayr |
17.08 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
08/1964 |
17.23 |
|
|
1198
|
|
61198
|
|
02/06/1947 |
Tweedmouth |
05/04/1965 |
York (North) |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1965 |
17.96 |
|
|
1199
|
|
61199
|
|
04/06/1947 |
Tweedmouth |
05/01/1967 |
York (North) |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1967 |
19.79 |
|
|
1200
|
|
61200
|
|
06/06/1947 |
Kings Cross |
29/12/1962 |
Kings Cross |
15.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1963 |
15.71 |
|
|
1201
|
|
61201
|
|
10/06/1947 |
Doncaster |
01/01/1962 |
Agecroft |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
30/01/1962 |
14.65 |
|
|
1202
|
|
61202
|
|
12/06/1947 |
Immingham |
16/09/1962 |
Lincoln |
15.25 |
|
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
01/1963 |
15.61 |
|
|
1203
|
|
61203
|
|
17/06/1947 |
Kings Cross |
23/07/1962 |
March |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
07/1962 |
15.09 |
|
|
1204
|
|
61204
|
19
|
19/06/1947 |
Immingham |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
03/1966 |
18.75 |
|
|
1205
|
|
61205
|
20
|
24/06/1947 |
Grantham |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
02/1965 |
17.66 |
|
|
1206
|
|
61206
|
|
03/07/1947 |
New England |
03/09/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1962 |
15.21 |
|
|
1207
|
|
61207
|
|
27/06/1947 |
New England |
28/12/1963 |
New England |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
02/1964 |
16.65 |
|
|
1208
|
|
61208
|
|
08/07/1947 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
26/09/1965 |
Doncaster |
18.17 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
11/1965 |
18.37 |
|
|
1209
|
|
61209
|
|
01/07/1947 |
New England |
16/09/1962 |
Colwick |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
02/1963 |
15.64 |
|
|
1210
|
|
61210
|
|
03/07/1947 |
New England |
10/02/1966 |
Doncaster |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
18.71 |
|
|
1211
|
|
61211
|
|
14/07/1947 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
05/11/1962 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
11/1962 |
15.35 |
|
|
1212
|
|
61212
|
|
08/07/1947 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
01/11/1964 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
17.33 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
01/1965 |
17.54 |
|
|
1213
|
|
61213
|
|
10/07/1947 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
19/04/1964 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
16.75 |
|
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
06/1964 |
16.95 |
|
|
1214
|
|
61214
|
|
16/07/1947 |
Stockton |
03/05/1965 |
Low Moor |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Dinsdale) |
06/1965 |
17.93 |
|
|
1215
|
|
61215
|
|
19/07/1947 |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
08/03/1965 |
Ardsley |
17.67 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1965 |
17.75 |
WILLIAM HENTON CARVER |
|
1216
|
|
61216
|
|
15/07/1947 |
York (North) |
23/01/1967 |
York (North) |
19.5 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
03/1967 |
19.68 |
|
|
1217
|
|
61217
|
|
11/08/1947 |
Carlisle Canal |
21/03/1962 |
Carlisle Canal |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
05/1962 |
14.77 |
|
|
1218
|
|
61218
|
|
01/08/1947 |
Neville Hill |
03/07/1965 |
Ardsley |
17.92 |
|
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
08/1965 |
18.05 |
|
|
1219
|
|
61219
|
|
09/08/1947 |
Carlisle Canal |
08/06/1964 |
St Margarets |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
08/1964 |
17.03 |
|
|
1220
|
|
61220
|
|
06/08/1947 |
Stockton |
04/10/1965 |
West Hartlepool |
18.17 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
11/1965 |
18.29 |
|
|
1221
|
|
61221
|
|
16/08/1947 |
Carlisle Canal |
27/03/1965 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
05/1965 |
17.76 |
SIR ALEXANDER ERSKINE-HILL |
|
1222
|
|
61222
|
|
11/08/1947 |
Carlisle Canal |
18/01/1962 |
Carlisle Canal |
14.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
01/1962 |
14.44 |
|
|
1223
|
|
61223
|
|
24/08/1947 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
02/01/1966 |
Immingham |
18.42 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
02/1966 |
18.49 |
|
|
1224
|
|
61224
|
|
15/08/1947 |
Heaton |
31/07/1966 |
Wakefield |
18.92 |
|
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
09/1966 |
19.10 |
|
|
1225
|
|
61225
|
|
28/08/1947 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
20/06/1965 |
Doncaster |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
08/1965 |
17.98 |
|
|
1226
|
|
61226
|
|
21/08/1947 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
22/11/1962 |
15.27 |
|
|
1227
|
|
61227
|
|
21/08/1947 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
22/09/1963 |
Colwick |
16.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1964 |
16.41 |
|
|
1228
|
|
61228
|
|
28/08/1947 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
05/1963 |
15.72 |
|
|
1229
|
|
61229
|
|
02/09/1947 |
Ardsley |
29/06/1964 |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
16.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
08/09/1964 |
17.03 |
|
|
1230
|
|
61230
|
|
04/09/1947 |
Ardsley |
19/11/1962 |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/01/1963 |
15.36 |
|
|
1231
|
|
61231
|
|
09/09/1947 |
Doncaster |
30/07/1962 |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
14.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
08/1962 |
14.94 |
|
|
1232
|
|
61232
|
|
10/09/1947 |
Stratford |
19/02/1966 |
Parkeston Quay |
18.42 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
05/1966 |
18.69 |
|
|
1233
|
|
61233
|
21
|
10/09/1947 |
Stratford |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
05/1966 |
18.69 |
|
|
1234
|
|
61234
|
|
16/09/1947 |
Stratford |
13/08/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
14.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
08/1962 |
14.92 |
|
|
1235
|
|
61235
|
|
18/09/1947 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
Immingham |
15 |
|
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
01/1963 |
15.34 |
|
|
1236
|
|
61236
|
|
26/09/1947 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
March |
15 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.48 |
|
|
1237
|
|
61237
|
|
24/09/1947 |
Neville Hill |
06/12/1966 |
Wakefield |
19.25 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
16/02/1967 |
19.41 |
GEOFFREY H KITSON |
|
1238
|
|
61238
|
|
26/09/1947 |
Gateshead |
17/02/1967 |
York (North) |
19.42 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
24/04/1967 |
19.59 |
LESLIE RUNCIMAN |
|
1239
|
|
61239
|
|
02/10/1947 |
York (North) |
27/08/1962 |
Gorton |
14.83 |
|
|
|
|
14.88 |
|
|
1240
|
|
61240
|
|
06/10/1947 |
York (North) |
06/12/1966 |
Wakefield |
19.17 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
16/02/1967 |
19.38 |
HARRY HINCHLIFFE |
|
1241
|
|
61241
|
|
08/10/1947 |
Heaton |
02/12/1962 |
Heaton |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
19/03/1963 |
15.45 |
VISCOUNT RIDLEY |
|
1242
|
|
61242
|
|
10/10/1947 |
Kittybrewster |
23/07/1964 |
Dalry Road |
16.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
11/1964 |
17.11 |
ALEXANDER REITH GRAY |
|
1243
|
|
61243
|
|
14/10/1947 |
Eastfield |
04/05/1964 |
Ayr |
16.58 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Troon) |
07/1964 |
16.76 |
SIR HAROLD MITCHELL |
|
1244
|
|
61244
|
|
20/10/1947 |
Haymarket |
29/10/1965 |
St Margarets |
18 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
12/1965 |
18.17 |
STRANG STEEL |
|
1245
|
|
61245
|
|
20/10/1947 |
Haymarket |
05/07/1965 |
Dalry Road |
17.75 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
08/1965 |
17.83 |
MURRAY OF ELIBANK |
|
1246
|
|
61246
|
|
22/10/1947 |
Doncaster |
29/12/1962 |
St Margarets |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
02/1963 |
15.33 |
LORD BALFOUR OF BURLEIGH |
|
1247
|
|
61247
|
|
24/10/1947 |
Doncaster |
12/06/1962 |
Colwick |
14.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
06/1962 |
14.65 |
LORD BURGHLEY |
|
1248
|
|
61248
|
|
27/10/1947 |
Doncaster |
07/11/1965 |
Colwick |
18.08 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
18.15 |
GEOFFREY GIBBS |
|
1249
|
|
61249
|
|
31/10/1947 |
Doncaster |
04/06/1964 |
Canklow |
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
08/1964 |
16.80 |
FITZHERBERT WRIGHT |
|
1250
|
|
61250
|
|
31/10/1947 |
Doncaster |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
18.5 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
05/1966 |
18.55 |
A HAROLD BIBBY |
|
1251
|
|
61251
|
|
04/11/1947 |
Ipswich |
19/04/1964 |
Immingham |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1964 |
16.62 |
OLIVER BURY |
|
1252
|
|
61252
|
22
|
06/11/1947 |
Ipswich |
25/11/1963 |
March |
16 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
06/1964 |
16.62 |
|
|
1253
|
|
61253
|
|
10/11/1947 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
14.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
19/11/1962 |
15.04 |
|
|
1254
|
|
61254
|
|
12/11/1947 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
March |
14.83 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
15.60 |
|
|
1255
|
|
61255
|
|
14/11/1947 |
Heaton |
24/06/1967 |
Hull Dairycoates |
19.58 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
08/1967 |
19.76 |
|
|
1256
|
|
61256
|
|
17/11/1947 |
Neville Hill |
07/11/1965 |
York (North) |
18 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
12/1965 |
18.09 |
|
|
1257
|
|
61257
|
|
19/11/1947 |
Neville Hill |
04/10/1965 |
West Hartlepool |
17.92 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
11/1965 |
18.00 |
|
|
1258
|
|
61258
|
|
21/11/1947 |
Neville Hill |
05/01/1964 |
Lincoln |
16.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
18/03/1964 |
16.33 |
|
|
1259
|
|
61259
|
|
24/11/1947 |
Neville Hill |
26/08/1965 |
Ardsley |
17.75 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1965 |
17.90 |
|
|
1260
|
|
61260
|
|
26/11/1947 |
Eastfield |
29/12/1962 |
St Margarets |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Inverurie) |
07/1963 |
15.64 |
|
|
1261
|
|
61261
|
|
28/11/1947 |
Eastfield |
23/09/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
18.83 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
11/1966 |
18.98 |
|
|
1262
|
|
61262
|
|
01/12/1947 |
Thornton Junction |
22/04/1967 |
|
19.33 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
01/1968 |
20.14 |
|
|
1263
|
|
61263
|
|
03/12/1947 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
31/12/1966 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
19 |
|
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
27/02/1967 |
19.25 |
|
|
1264
|
|
61264
|
29
|
05/12/1947 |
Stratford |
21/11/1965 |
Colwick |
17.92 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
|
1265
|
|
61265
|
|
08/12/1947 |
Doncaster |
19/02/1962 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/04/1962 |
14.35 |
|
|
1266
|
|
61266
|
|
10/12/1947 |
Kings Cross |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
14.75 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
01/1963 |
15.11 |
|
|
1267
|
|
61267
|
|
12/12/1947 |
Ardsley |
10/12/1962 |
West Hartlepool |
15 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
13/02/1963 |
15.18 |
|
|
1268
|
|
61268
|
|
16/12/1947 |
Ardsley |
28/12/1964 |
Ardsley |
17 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1965 |
17.26 |
|
|
1269
|
|
61269
|
|
24/12/1947 |
Lincoln |
21/12/1963 |
Gorton |
16 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
12/1964 |
16.99 |
|
|
1270
|
|
61270
|
|
25/12/1947 |
Norwich Thorpe |
22/09/1963 |
Doncaster |
15.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
10/1963 |
15.82 |
|
|
1271
|
|
61271
|
|
26/12/1947 |
Norwich Thorpe |
30/07/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
20/08/1962 |
14.66 |
|
|
1272
|
|
61272
|
25
|
29/12/1947 |
Norwich Thorpe |
03/01/1965 |
New England |
17.08 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
01/1966 |
18.06 |
|
|
1273
|
|
61273
|
|
30/12/1947 |
Darlington |
07/05/1963 |
York (North) |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
16/05/1963 |
15.39 |
|
|
1274
|
|
61274
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Darlington |
23/11/1964 |
Wakefield |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
01/1965 |
17.05 |
|
|
1275
|
|
61275
|
|
12/01/1948 |
Darlington |
28/10/1965 |
York (North) |
17.75 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
17.94 |
|
|
1276
|
|
61276
|
|
14/01/1948 |
Darlington |
28/06/1965 |
York (North) |
17.42 |
|
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
08/1965 |
17.60 |
|
|
1277
|
|
61277
|
|
16/01/1948 |
Kittybrewster |
02/06/1964 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
08/1964 |
16.59 |
|
|
1278
|
|
61278
|
|
19/01/1948 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
22/04/1967 |
Dundee West |
19.25 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Carmyle) |
01/1968 |
20.00 |
|
|
1279
|
|
61279
|
|
21/01/1948 |
Lincoln |
22/09/1963 |
Doncaster |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
30/10/1963 |
15.78 |
|
|
1280
|
|
61280
|
|
23/01/1948 |
Lincoln |
16/09/1962 |
March |
14.67 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
11/1963 |
15.82 |
|
|
1281
|
|
61281
|
|
27/01/1948 |
Lincoln |
19/02/1966 |
Colwick |
18.08 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
05/1966 |
18.31 |
|
|
1282
|
|
61282
|
|
28/01/1948 |
Colwick |
16/09/1962 |
New England |
14.67 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
01/1963 |
14.98 |
|
|
1283
|
|
61283
|
|
02/02/1948 |
Colwick |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
26/11/1962 |
14.82 |
|
|
1284
|
|
61284
|
|
06/02/1948 |
Immingham |
16/09/1962 |
Lincoln |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
01/1963 |
14.95 |
|
|
1285
|
|
61285
|
|
09/02/1948 |
Cambridge |
19/12/1965 |
Colwick |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield) |
02/1966 |
18.03 |
|
|
1286
|
|
61286
|
|
11/02/1948 |
Cambridge |
16/09/1962 |
March |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
06/1963 |
15.35 |
|
|
1287
|
|
61287
|
|
13/02/1948 |
Cambridge |
16/09/1962 |
March |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1963 |
15.09 |
|
|
|
E1288
|
61288
|
|
16/02/1948 |
Darlington |
06/01/1964 |
York (North) |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
27/01/1964 |
15.96 |
|
|
|
E1289
|
61289
|
|
18/02/1948 |
Darlington |
24/06/1967 |
Hull Dairycoates |
19.33 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
08/1967 |
19.50 |
|
|
|
E1290
|
61290
|
|
20/02/1948 |
Darlington |
21/03/1962 |
Carlisle Canal |
14.08 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
07/1962 |
14.41 |
|
|
|
E1291
|
61291
|
|
24/02/1948 |
Darlington |
20/05/1965 |
Ardsley |
17.25 |
|
Cut |
Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) |
06/1965 |
17.32 |
|
|
|
E1292
|
61292
|
|
25/02/1948 |
Thornton Junction |
10/09/1965 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
10/1965 |
17.65 |
|
|
|
E1293
|
61293
|
|
27/02/1948 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
17/08/1966 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
18.5 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1966 |
18.64 |
|
|
|
E1294
|
61294
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
13/11/1964 |
St Margarets |
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
01/1965 |
16.89 |
|
|
|
E1295
|
61295
|
|
03/03/1948 |
Ardsley |
25/11/1962 |
Ardsley |
14.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
07/02/1963 |
14.94 |
|
|
|
E1296
|
61296
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Ardsley |
19/11/1962 |
Wakefield |
14.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/02/1963 |
14.92 |
|
|
|
E1297
|
61297
|
|
10/03/1948 |
Ardsley |
25/11/1962 |
Ardsley |
14.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
08/02/1963 |
14.93 |
|
|
|
E1298
|
61298
|
|
11/03/1948 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
14/06/1962 |
Gorton |
14.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
02/07/1962 |
14.32 |
|
|
|
E1299
|
61299
|
|
12/03/1948 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
25/07/1965 |
Colwick |
17.33 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
09/1965 |
17.52 |
|
|
|
E1300
|
61300
|
23
|
15/03/1948 |
March |
25/11/1963 |
March |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
01/1966 |
17.85 |
|
|
|
E1301
|
61301
|
|
17/03/1948 |
Cambridge |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
14.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
03/12/1962 |
14.72 |
|
|
|
E1302
|
61302
|
|
22/03/1948 |
Cambridge |
02/04/1966 |
Colwick |
18.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
05/1966 |
18.16 |
|
|
|
E1303
|
61303
|
|
26/03/1948 |
Darlington |
21/11/1966 |
York (North) |
18.67 |
|
Cut |
Arnott Young (Parkgate) |
02/1967 |
18.90 |
|
|
|
|
61304
|
|
31/03/1948 |
Hull Dairycoates |
31/10/1965 |
Ardsley |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
17.72 |
|
|
|
|
61305
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Hull Dairycoates |
21/10/1963 |
Hull Dairycoates |
15.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/1963 |
15.55 |
|
|
|
|
61306
|
|
05/04/1948 |
Hull Dairycoates |
30/09/1967 |
Low Moor |
19.42 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
|
|
|
61307
|
|
07/04/1948 |
Kittybrewster |
19/11/1966 |
St Margarets |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
12/1966 |
18.70 |
|
|
|
|
61308
|
|
09/04/1948 |
Kittybrewster |
19/11/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
12/1966 |
18.70 |
|
|
|
|
61309
|
|
15/04/1948 |
Ardsley |
23/01/1967 |
Wakefield |
18.75 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
03/1967 |
18.93 |
|
|
|
|
61310
|
|
19/04/1948 |
Ardsley |
05/04/1965 |
Ardsley |
17 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
05/1965 |
17.08 |
|
|
|
|
61311
|
|
21/04/1948 |
Sheffield Darnall |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
14.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
14/11/1962 |
14.58 |
|
|
|
|
61312
|
|
23/04/1948 |
Sheffield Darnall |
01/03/1964 |
Mexborough |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
05/1964 |
16.07 |
|
|
|
|
61313
|
|
27/04/1948 |
Gorton |
14/11/1965 |
Langwith Junction |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
12/1965 |
17.65 |
|
|
|
|
61314
|
|
29/04/1948 |
Gorton |
28/12/1963 |
New England |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
04/03/1964 |
15.86 |
|
|
|
|
61315
|
32
|
30/04/1948 |
Gorton |
10/02/1966 |
Shirebrook |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) |
02/10/1968 |
20.44 |
|
|
|
|
61316
|
|
04/05/1948 |
Gorton |
29/12/1962 |
Canklow |
14.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1963 |
15.12 |
|
|
|
|
61317
|
|
06/05/1948 |
Gorton |
16/09/1962 |
Immingham |
14.33 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Ickles) |
01/1963 |
14.70 |
|
|
|
|
61318
|
|
11/05/1948 |
Immingham |
22/09/1963 |
Immingham |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
02/1964 |
15.78 |
|
|
|
|
61319
|
|
14/05/1948 |
Borough Gardens |
16/12/1966 |
York (North) |
18.58 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
16/02/1967 |
18.77 |
|
|
|
|
61320
|
|
18/05/1948 |
Borough Gardens |
19/08/1965 |
Wakefield |
17.25 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1965 |
17.42 |
|
|
|
|
61321
|
|
20/05/1948 |
Borough Gardens |
10/08/1964 |
Ardsley |
16.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
07/09/1964 |
16.31 |
|
|
|
|
61322
|
|
25/05/1948 |
Borough Gardens |
20/02/1966 |
Hull Dairycoates |
17.75 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
04/1966 |
17.90 |
|
|
|
|
61323
|
24
|
27/05/1948 |
Kittybrewster |
25/11/1963 |
March |
15.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
17/02/1964 |
15.74 |
|
|
|
|
61324
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Kittybrewster |
12/10/1965 |
St Margarets |
17.33 |
|
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
12/1965 |
17.55 |
|
|
|
|
61325
|
|
03/06/1948 |
Immingham |
22/09/1963 |
Immingham |
15.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
11/1963 |
15.46 |
|
|
|
|
61326
|
|
08/06/1948 |
Gorton |
20/03/1966 |
Doncaster |
17.75 |
|
Cut |
W George, Station Steel (Wath) |
05/1966 |
17.95 |
|
|
|
|
61327
|
|
11/06/1948 |
Gorton |
14/02/1965 |
Canklow |
16.67 |
|
Cut |
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
04/1965 |
16.85 |
|
|
|
|
61328
|
|
16/06/1948 |
Immingham |
22/09/1963 |
Immingham |
15.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
01/1964 |
15.59 |
|
|
|
|
61329
|
|
18/06/1948 |
New England |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
17.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
05/1966 |
17.92 |
|
|
|
|
61330
|
|
23/06/1948 |
New England |
19/11/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
18.42 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
12/1966 |
18.49 |
|
|
|
|
61331
|
|
25/06/1948 |
New England |
22/09/1963 |
New England |
15.25 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
22/01/1964 |
15.59 |
|
|
|
|
61332
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Cambridge |
29/12/1962 |
Thornton Junction |
14.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
04/1963 |
14.80 |
|
|
|
|
61333
|
|
02/07/1948 |
Cambridge |
29/12/1962 |
Parkhead |
14.42 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
07/1963 |
15.04 |
|
|
|
|
61334
|
|
07/07/1948 |
Norwich Thorpe |
01/12/1963 |
Gorton |
15.42 |
|
Cut |
Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) |
10/1964 |
16.28 |
|
|
|
|
61335
|
|
15/07/1948 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
14/11/1962 |
14.34 |
|
|
|
|
61336
|
|
05/08/1948 |
Stratford |
22/09/1963 |
Colwick |
15.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1963 |
15.37 |
|
|
|
|
61337
|
|
12/08/1948 |
Neville Hill |
30/09/1967 |
Low Moor |
19.08 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
11/1967 |
19.27 |
|
|
|
|
61338
|
|
20/08/1948 |
Neville Hill |
11/01/1965 |
Wakefield |
16.42 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1965 |
16.58 |
|
|
|
|
61339
|
|
08/09/1948 |
Neville Hill |
25/11/1962 |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
01/1963 |
14.36 |
|
|
|
|
61340
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Eastfield |
22/04/1967 |
Dundee West |
18.42 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
07/07/1967 |
18.62 |
|
|
|
|
61341
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Eastfield |
28/12/1963 |
St Margarets |
15 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
02/1964 |
15.17 |
|
|
|
|
61342
|
|
03/01/1949 |
Eastfield |
31/12/1966 |
Motherwell |
17.92 |
|
Cut |
J McWilliams (Shettleston) |
27/02/1967 |
18.16 |
|
|
|
|
61343
|
|
04/02/1949 |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
03/03/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
17.08 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
04/1966 |
17.20 |
|
|
|
|
61344
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Eastfield |
23/09/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
17.5 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
11/1966 |
17.71 |
|
|
|
|
61345
|
|
08/04/1949 |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
14/07/1966 |
St Margarets |
17.25 |
|
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
09/1966 |
17.45 |
|
|
|
|
61346
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
08/06/1964 |
Thornton Junction |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
08/1964 |
15.30 |
|
|
|
|
61347
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
04/04/1967 |
Thornton Junction |
17.92 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
07/07/1967 |
18.14 |
|
|
|
|
61348
|
|
09/06/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
26/12/1965 |
Colwick |
16.5 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
02/1966 |
16.70 |
|
|
|
|
61349
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
17/08/1966 |
Thornton Junction |
17.08 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1966 |
17.30 |
|
|
|
|
61350
|
|
28/07/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
19/11/1966 |
|
17.33 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
12/1966 |
17.39 |
|
|
|
|
61351
|
|
16/08/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
13/07/1964 |
Dalry Road |
14.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
09/1964 |
15.09 |
|
|
|
|
61352
|
|
25/08/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
22/10/1962 |
Gorton |
13.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
01/1963 |
13.40 |
|
|
|
|
61353
|
|
06/09/1949 |
Kittybrewster |
16/08/1965 |
Wakefield |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1965 |
16.12 |
|
|
|
|
61354
|
|
14/09/1949 |
St Margarets |
22/04/1967 |
Dundee West |
17.58 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
09/1967 |
18.01 |
|
|
|
|
61355
|
|
21/09/1949 |
St Margarets |
08/06/1964 |
Ayr |
14.75 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1964 |
15.08 |
|
|
|
|
61356
|
|
28/09/1949 |
St Margarets |
23/07/1964 |
St Margarets |
14.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
10/1964 |
15.06 |
|
|
|
|
61357
|
|
10/10/1949 |
St Margarets |
08/06/1965 |
St Margarets |
15.67 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
10/1965 |
16.02 |
|
|
|
|
61358
|
|
18/10/1949 |
St Margarets |
25/12/1963 |
Thornton Junction |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
02/1964 |
14.34 |
|
|
|
|
61359
|
|
26/10/1949 |
St Margarets |
28/12/1963 |
St Margarets |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
01/1964 |
14.23 |
|
|
|
|
61360
|
|
22/03/1950 |
Stratford |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
16.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
08/1966 |
16.41 |
|
|
|
|
61361
|
|
24/03/1950 |
Stratford |
26/12/1965 |
Colwick |
15.75 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
03/1966 |
15.99 |
|
|
|
|
61362
|
|
31/03/1950 |
Stratford |
16/09/1962 |
Stratford |
12.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
12/1962 |
12.72 |
|
|
|
|
61363
|
|
05/04/1950 |
Stratford |
23/09/1962 |
March |
12.42 |
|
Cut |
Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) |
01/1964 |
13.79 |
|
|
|
|
61364
|
|
19/04/1950 |
Lincoln |
16/09/1962 |
New England |
12.42 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
02/1963 |
12.84 |
|
|
|
|
61365
|
|
21/04/1950 |
Immingham |
11/07/1965 |
Immingham |
15.25 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1965 |
15.50 |
|
|
|
|
61366
|
|
24/04/1950 |
Immingham |
17/12/1962 |
Immingham |
12.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
12/1963 |
13.65 |
|
|
|
|
61367
|
|
28/04/1950 |
Colwick |
22/08/1965 |
Doncaster |
15.33 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
28/12/1965 |
15.68 |
|
|
|
|
61368
|
|
30/04/1950 |
|
29/01/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
11.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1962 |
11.88 |
|
|
|
|
61369
|
|
16/05/1950 |
Colwick |
21/12/1963 |
Gorton |
13.58 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
02/1965 |
14.76 |
|
|
|
|
61370
|
|
10/10/1950 |
Lincoln |
04/07/1965 |
Frodingham |
14.75 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
10/1965 |
15.02 |
|
|
|
|
61371
|
|
24/10/1950 |
Lincoln |
16/09/1962 |
March |
11.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
05/1963 |
12.56 |
|
|
|
|
61372
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Immingham |
20/06/1965 |
Langwith Junction |
14.5 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Beighton) |
09/1965 |
14.78 |
|
|
|
|
61373
|
|
26/12/1950 |
Immingham |
16/09/1962 |
Sheffield Darnall |
11.75 |
|
Cut |
Albert Looms (Spondon) |
01/1964 |
13.06 |
|
|
|
|
61374
|
|
12/02/1951 |
Immingham |
22/09/1963 |
Immingham |
12.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
03/1964 |
13.10 |
|
|
|
|
61375
|
24
|
23/02/1951 |
Immingham |
25/11/1963 |
March |
12.75 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
08/1966 |
15.48 |
|
|
|
|
61376
|
|
12/04/1951 |
Colwick |
05/02/1962 |
Leicester (G.C.) |
10.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1962 |
10.93 |
|
|
|
|
61377
|
|
01/05/1951 |
Colwick |
16/09/1962 |
Langwith Junction |
11.33 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Broughton Lane, Sheffield) |
02/1963 |
11.80 |
|
|
|
|
61378
|
|
25/05/1951 |
Colwick |
25/11/1963 |
March |
12.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
01/1964 |
12.65 |
|
|
|
|
61379
|
|
14/06/1951 |
Colwick |
06/08/1962 |
Immingham |
11.17 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
08/1962 |
11.18 |
MAYFLOWER |
|
|
|
61380
|
|
22/08/1951 |
Colwick |
26/03/1962 |
Woodford Halse |
10.58 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
05/1962 |
10.74 |
|
|
|
|
61381
|
|
07/09/1951 |
Colwick |
01/11/1962 |
Gorton |
11.17 |
438,292 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
03/1963 |
11.53 |
|
|
|
|
61382
|
|
18/09/1951 |
Ardsley |
07/12/1964 |
Ardsley |
13.25 |
|
Cut |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
04/1965 |
13.58 |
|
|
|
|
61383
|
|
03/10/1951 |
Ardsley |
21/01/1963 |
Low Moor |
11.25 |
308,084 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Darlington) |
04/1963 |
11.54 |
|
|
|
|
61384
|
|
17/10/1951 |
Ardsley |
09/01/1966 |
Immingham |
14.25 |
|
Cut |
Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) |
06/1966 |
14.67 |
|
|
|
|
61385
|
|
25/10/1951 |
Ardsley |
31/10/1965 |
Ardsley |
14 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
02/1966 |
14.32 |
|
|
|
|
61386
|
|
30/10/1951 |
Ardsley |
31/12/1966 |
Blyth (North) |
15.17 |
|
Cut |
W Willoughby (Choppington) |
03/1967 |
15.38 |
|
|
|
|
61387
|
|
02/11/1951 |
Ardsley |
31/10/1965 |
Wakefield |
13.92 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
03/1966 |
14.38 |
|
|
|
|
61388
|
|
09/11/1951 |
Ardsley |
24/06/1967 |
Wakefield |
15.58 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
10/1967 |
15.94 |
|
|
|
|
61389
|
|
30/11/1951 |
New England |
14/11/1965 |
Frodingham |
14 |
|
Cut |
Drapers (Hull) |
03/1966 |
14.30 |
|
|
|
|
61390
|
|
12/12/1951 |
New England |
19/02/1966 |
Colwick |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
Birds (Long Marston) |
07/1966 |
14.60 |
|
|
|
|
61391
|
|
18/12/1951 |
New England |
10/09/1962 |
New England |
10.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
09/1962 |
10.75 |
|
|
|
|
61392
|
|
27/12/1951 |
New England |
20/06/1965 |
Colwick |
13.5 |
|
Cut |
T W Ward (Killamarsh) |
10/1965 |
13.81 |
|
|
|
|
61393
|
|
11/01/1952 |
Doncaster |
22/09/1963 |
Mexborough |
11.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
09/1963 |
11.68 |
|
|
|
|
61394
|
|
23/01/1952 |
Doncaster |
14/11/1965 |
Langwith Junction |
13.83 |
|
Cut |
Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) |
03/1966 |
14.15 |
|
|
|
|
61395
|
|
01/02/1952 |
Carlisle Canal |
01/10/1962 |
Gorton |
10.67 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) |
11/1962 |
10.79 |
|
|
|
|
61396
|
|
20/02/1952 |
Eastfield |
10/09/1965 |
St Margarets |
13.58 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
11/1965 |
13.75 |
|
|
|
|
61397
|
|
13/03/1952 |
St Margarets |
26/06/1965 |
St Margarets |
13.25 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
09/1965 |
13.52 |
|
|
|
|
61398
|
|
28/03/1952 |
St Margarets |
05/11/1964 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
12.67 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
01/1965 |
12.81 |
|
|
|
|
61399
|
|
22/04/1952 |
Doncaster |
22/09/1963 |
Canklow |
11.42 |
|
Cut |
Marples and Gillot (Sheffield) |
12/1963 |
11.65 |
|
|
|
|
61400
|
|
30/03/1950 |
Kittybrewster |
17/12/1964 |
Thornton Junction |
14.75 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
02/1965 |
14.89 |
|
|
|
|
61401
|
|
12/04/1950 |
Kittybrewster |
17/04/1964 |
Thornton Junction |
14 |
|
Cut |
Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) |
06/1964 |
14.19 |
|
|
|
|
61402
|
|
27/04/1950 |
Kittybrewster |
08/06/1964 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
14.17 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
08/1964 |
14.31 |
|
|
|
|
61403
|
|
27/04/1950 |
Kittybrewster |
14/07/1966 |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
16.25 |
|
Cut |
Campbells (Airdrie) |
09/1966 |
16.40 |
|
|
|
|
61404
|
|
04/05/1950 |
Kittybrewster |
09/11/1965 |
St Margarets |
15.5 |
|
Cut |
Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) |
12/1965 |
15.63 |
|
|
|
|
61405
|
|
10/05/1950 |
Lincoln |
16/09/1962 |
Lincoln |
12.33 |
|
Cut |
Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) |
01/1963 |
12.69 |
|
|
|
|
61406
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Lincoln |
17/04/1966 |
Doncaster |
15.92 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
05/1966 |
16.00 |
|
|
|
|
61407
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Immingham |
22/04/1967 |
Thornton Junction |
16.83 |
|
Cut |
P.W. McLellan (Langloan) |
07/07/1967 |
17.08 |
|
|
|
|
61408
|
|
13/06/1950 |
Immingham |
29/12/1962 |
Immingham |
12.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
02/1963 |
12.68 |
|
|
|
|
61409
|
|
15/06/1950 |
Immingham |
22/09/1963 |
Lincoln |
13.25 |
|
Cut |
R A Kings (Norwich) |
01/1964 |
13.59 |
|