LNER Gresley "B17" Class 4-6-0
LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2800 | 1600 | 61600 | 07/12/1928 | 28/07/1958 | 29.58 | 29.71 | ||||||
2801 | 1601 | 61601 | 05/12/1928 | 13/01/1958 | 29.08 | 29.13 | ||||||
2802 | 1602 | 61602 | 11/1928 | 13/01/1958 | 29.17 | 29.19 | ||||||
2803 | 61603 | 13/12/1928 | 08/09/1958 | 10/1946 to B2 |
29.75 | 29.78 | ||||||
2804 | 1604 | 61604 | 13/12/1928 | 24/08/1953 | 24.67 | 24.69 | ||||||
2805 | 1605 | 61605 | 17/12/1928 | 15/05/1958 | 29.42 | 29.43 | ||||||
2806 | 1606 | 61606 | 19/12/1928 | 01/09/1958 | 29.75 | 29.76 | ||||||
2807 | 1607 | 61607 | 21/12/1928 | 14/01/1960 | 05/1947 to B2 |
31.08 | 31.00 | |||||
2808 | 1608 | 61608 | 26/12/1928 | 14/03/1960 | 31.25 | 31.24 | ||||||
2809 | 1609 | 61609 | 27/12/1928 | 23/06/1958 | 29.5 | 29.48 | ||||||
2810 | 1610 | 61610 | 22/08/1930 | 11/01/1960 | 29.42 | 29.42 | ||||||
2811 | 1611 | 61611 | 22/08/1930 | 14/10/1959 | 29.17 | 29.17 | ||||||
2812 | 1612 | 61612 | 22/10/1930 | 29/09/1959 | 28.92 | 29.00 | ||||||
2813 | 1613 | 61613 | 22/10/1930 | 18/12/1959 | 29.17 | 29.17 | ||||||
2814 | 61614 | 23/10/1930 | 08/06/1959 | 11/1946 to B2 |
28.67 | 28.66 | ||||||
2815 | 61615 | 29/10/1930 | 09/02/1959 | 04/1946 to B2 |
28.33 | 28.32 | ||||||
2816 | 61616 | 10/1930 | 07/09/1959 | 11/1945 to B2 |
28.92 | 28.94 | ||||||
2817 | 1617 | 61617 | 10/1930 | 11/08/1958 | 12/1946 to B2 |
27.83 | 27.85 | |||||
2818 | 1618 | 61618 | 05/11/1930 | 23/01/1960 | 29.17 | 29.21 | ||||||
2819 | 1619 | 61619 | 08/11/1930 | 19/09/1958 | 27.83 | 27.87 | ||||||
2820 | 1620 | 61620 | 12/11/1930 | 25/01/1960 | 29.17 | 29.19 | ||||||
2821 | 1621 | 61621 | 21/11/1930 | 10/11/1958 | 28 | 28.00 | ||||||
2822 | 1622 | 61622 | 30/01/1931 | 27/09/1958 | 27.67 | 27.64 | ||||||
2823 | 1623 | 61623 | 03/02/1931 | 31/07/1959 | 28.42 | 28.59 | ||||||
2824 | 1624 | 61624 | 09/02/1931 | 16/03/1953 | 22.08 | 22.11 | ||||||
2825 | 1625 | 61625 | 16/02/1931 | 03/12/1959 | 28.83 | 28.85 | ||||||
2826 | 1626 | 61626 | 04/03/1931 | 11/01/1960 | 28.83 | 28.89 | ||||||
2827 | 1627 | 61627 | 18/03/1931 | 17/07/1959 | 28.33 | 28.35 | ||||||
2828 | 1628 | 61628 | 23/03/1931 | 15/09/1952 | 21.5 | 21.50 | ||||||
2829 | 1629 | 61629 | 08/04/1931 | 25/09/1959 | 28.42 | 28.46 | ||||||
2830 | 1630 | 61630 | 28/04/1931 | 19/08/1958 | 27.33 | 27.32 | ||||||
2831 | 1631 | 61631 | 01/05/1931 | 10/04/1959 | 27.92 | 27.98 | ||||||
2832 | 61632 | 12/05/1931 | 02/02/1959 | 07/1946 to B2 |
27.75 | 27.78 | ||||||
2833 | 1633 | 61633 | 28/05/1931 | 30/09/1959 | 28.33 | 28.40 | ||||||
2834 | 1634 | 61634 | 17/06/1931 | 04/08/1958 | 27.17 | 27.18 | ||||||
2835 | 1635 | 61635 | 02/07/1931 | 29/01/1959 | 27.5 | 27.64 | ||||||
2836 | 1636 | 61636 | 16/07/1931 | 21/10/1959 | 28.25 | 28.27 | ||||||
2837 | 1637 | 61637 | 01/03/1933 | 24/09/1959 | 26.5 | 26.56 | ||||||
2838 | 1638 | 61638 | 02/03/1933 | 17/03/1958 | 25 | 25.05 | ||||||
2839 | 1639 | 61639 | 11/05/1933 | 18/05/1959 | 01/1946 to B2 |
26 | 26.03 | |||||
2840 | 1640 | 61640 | 18/05/1933 | 15/11/1958 | 25.5 | 25.51 | ||||||
2841 | 1641 | 61641 | 25/05/1933 | 28/01/1960 | 26.67 | 26.66 | ||||||
2842 | 1642 | 61642 | 05/1933 | 15/09/1958 | 25.33 | 25.35 | ||||||
2843 | 1643 | 61643 | 03/05/1935 | 14/07/1958 | 23.17 | 23.22 | ||||||
2844 | 1644 | 61644 | 09/05/1935 | 25/11/1959 | 03/1949 to B2 |
24.5 | 24.54 | |||||
2845 | 1645 | 61645 | 14/06/1935 | 26/02/1959 | 23.67 | 23.69 | ||||||
2846 | 1646 | 61646 | 23/08/1935 | 09/01/1959 | 23.42 | 23.41 | ||||||
2847 | 1647 | 61647 | 10/09/1935 | 18/11/1959 | 24.17 | 24.20 | ||||||
2848 | 1648 | 61648 | 03/03/1936 | 01/12/1958 | 22.75 | 22.80 | ||||||
2849 | 1649 | 61649 | 09/03/1936 | 10/02/1958 | 21.92 | 22.95 | ||||||
2850 | 1650 | 61650 | 09/03/1936 | 03/09/1958 | 22.5 | 22.53 | ||||||
2851 | 1651 | 61651 | 30/03/1936 | 14/08/1959 | 23.42 | 23.39 | ||||||
2852 | 1652 | 61652 | 02/04/1936 | 17/09/1959 | 23.42 | 23.47 | ||||||
2853 | 1653 | 61653 | 06/04/1936 | 25/01/1960 | 23.75 | 23.79 | ||||||
2854 | 1654 | 61654 | 17/04/1936 | 06/11/1959 | 23.58 | 23.59 | ||||||
2855 | 1655 | 61655 | 29/04/1936 | 09/04/1959 | 23 | 22.98 | ||||||
2856 | 1656 | 61656 | 06/05/1936 | 27/01/1960 | 23.67 | 23.71 | ||||||
2857 | 1657 | 61657 | 15/05/1936 | 03/06/1960 | 24.08 | 24.10 | ||||||
2858 | 1658 | 61658 | 28/05/1936 | 03/12/1959 | 23.58 | 23.56 | ||||||
2859 | 1659 | 61659 | 11/06/1936 | 14/03/1960 | 23.75 | 23.78 | ||||||
2860 | 1660 | 61660 | 19/06/1936 | 02/06/1960 | 24 | 24.01 | ||||||
2861 | 1661 | 61661 | 06/1936 | 23/07/1959 | 23.08 | 23.10 | ||||||
2862 | 1662 | 61662 | 13/01/1937 | 01/12/1959 | 22.92 | 22.93 | ||||||
2863 | 1663 | 61663 | 04/02/1937 | 20/02/1960 | 23 | 23.08 | ||||||
2864 | 1664 | 61664 | 15/01/1937 | 01/06/1960 | 23.42 | 23.43 | ||||||
2865 | 1665 | 61665 | 26/01/1937 | 16/04/1959 | 22.25 | 22.23 | ||||||
2866 | 1666 | 61666 | 15/02/1937 | 07/03/1960 | 23.08 | 23.09 | ||||||
2867 | 1667 | 61667 | 15/04/1937 | 23/06/1958 | 21.17 | 21.18 | ||||||
2868 | 1668 | 61668 | 28/04/1937 | 22/08/1960 | 23.33 | 23.32 | ||||||
2869 | 1669 | 61669 | 06/05/1937 | 26/09/1958 | 21.33 | 21.38 | ||||||
2870 | 1670 | 61670 | 13/05/1937 | 04/04/1960 | 22.92 | 22.94 | ||||||
2871 | 61671 | 11/06/1937 | 22/09/1958 | 08/1945 to B2 |
21.25 | 21.28 | ||||||
2872 | 1672 | 61672 | 19/07/1937 | 09/03/1960 | 22.67 | 22.67 |