GER/LNER Holden "F3" Class 2-4-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1090 | 8090 | 04/1893 | 10/1936 | Norwich Thorpe | 43.5 | |||||||
1091 | 8091 | 04/1893 | 07/1938 | Cambridge | 45.25 | |||||||
1092 | 8092 | 7114 | 67114 | 05/1893 | 12/03/1948 | Lowestoft | 54.83 | |||||
1093 | 8093 | 7115 | 67115 | 05/1893 | 13/05/1948 | Cambridge | 55 | |||||
1094 | 8094 | 7116 | 05/1893 | 11/1947 | Colchester | 54.5 | ||||||
1095 | 8095 | 7117 | 67117 | 06/1893 | 13/05/1948 | South Lynn | 54.92 | |||||
1096 | 8096 | 7118 | 06/1893 | 08/1947 | Lowestoft | 54.17 | ||||||
1097 | 8097 | 7119 | 67119 | 06/1893 | 18/02/1948 | Lowestoft | 54.67 | |||||
1098 | 8098 | 06/1893 | 12/1937 | Lowestoft | 44.5 | |||||||
1099 | 8099 | 7120 | 06/1893 | 12/1947 | Lowestoft | 54.5 | ||||||
1070 | 8070 | 7121 | 11/1893 | 04/1947 | Cambridge | 53.42 | ||||||
1071 | 8071 | 7122 | 11/1893 | 11/1947 | Lowestoft | 54 | ||||||
1072 | 8072 | 7123 | 12/1893 | 03/1947 | Norwich Thorpe | 53.25 | ||||||
1073 | 8073 | 12/1893 | 11/1938 | Bury St Edmunds | 44.92 | |||||||
1074 | 8074 | 12/1893 | 02/1937 | Colchester | 43.17 | |||||||
1075 | 8075 | 7124 | 67124 | 12/1893 | 03/1950 | Bury St Edmunds | 56.25 | 56.28 | ||||
1076 | 8076 | 01/1894 | 03/1937 | Colchester | 43.17 | |||||||
1077 | 8077 | 7125 | 01/1894 | 08/1947 | Lowestoft | 53.58 | ||||||
1078 | 8078 | 7126 | 67126 | 01/1894 | 01/1950 | Norwich Thorpe | 56 | |||||
1079 | 8079 | 7127 | 67127 | 01/1894 | 08/04/1953 | Ipswich | 59.25 | |||||
1080 | 8080 | 02/1894 | 12/1938 | Norwich Thorpe | 44.83 | |||||||
1081 | 8081 | 7128 | 67128 | 02/1894 | 04/12/1950 | Ipswich | 56.83 | |||||
1082 | 8082 | 7129 | 02/1894 | 08/1947 | Lowestoft | 53.5 | ||||||
1083 | 8083 | 03/1894 | 02/1938 | Lowestoft | 43.92 | |||||||
1084 | 8084 | 03/1894 | 05/1938 | Cambridge | 44.17 | |||||||
1085 | 8085 | 7130 | 04/1894 | 11/1947 | Colchester | 53.58 | ||||||
1086 | 8086 | 04/1894 | 04/1938 | Norwich Thorpe | 44 | |||||||
1087 | 8087 | 04/1894 | 10/1938 | Norwich Thorpe | 44.5 | |||||||
1088 | 8088 | 7131 | 04/1894 | 11/1947 | 53.58 | |||||||
1089 | 8089 | 7132 | 04/1894 | 11/1947 | 53.58 | |||||||
1060 | 8060 | 7133 | 05/1895 | 06/1947 | Cambridge | 52.08 | ||||||
1061 | 8061 | 7134 | 67134 | 05/1895 | 29/05/1948 | Norwich Thorpe | 53 | |||||
1062 | 8062 | 7135 | 05/1895 | 11/1947 | Lowestoft | 52.5 | ||||||
1063 | 8063 | 7136 | 05/1895 | 11/1947 | 52.5 | |||||||
1064 | 8064 | 7137 | 05/1895 | 11/1947 | Lowestoft | 52.5 | ||||||
1065 | 8065 | 05/1895 | 03/1938 | Bury St Edmunds | 42.83 | |||||||
1066 | 8066 | 7138 | 05/1895 | 08/1947 | Bury St Edmunds | 52.25 | ||||||
1067 | 8067 | 7139 | 67139 | 05/1895 | 12/1950 | Norwich Thorpe | 55.58 | |||||
1068 | 8068 | 7140 | 67140 | 05/1895 | 03/1949 | Ipswich | 53.83 | |||||
1069 | 8069 | 05/1895 | 03/1937 | Ipswich | 41.83 | |||||||
1040 | 8040 | 7141 | 67141 | 05/1902 | 29/05/1948 | Ipswich | 46 | |||||
1041 | 8041 | 7142 | 05/1902 | 04/1947 | Lowestoft | 44.92 | ||||||
1042 | 8042 | 7143 | 67143 | 05/1902 | 22/07/1948 | Ipswich | 46.17 | 46.28 | ||||
1043 | 8043 | 7144 | 05/1902 | 11/1947 | Ipswich | 45.5 | ||||||
1044 | 8044 | 7145 | 05/1902 | 04/1947 | Lowestoft | 44.92 | ||||||
1045 | 8045 | 7146 | 06/1902 | 08/1947 | Norwich Thorpe | 45.17 | ||||||
1046 | 8046 | 7147 | 06/1902 | 11/1947 | Kings Lynn | 45.42 | ||||||
1047 | 8047 | 7148 | 06/1902 | 07/1947 | Ipswich | 45.08 | ||||||
1048 | 8048 | 7149 | 67149 | 06/1902 | 18/07/1949 | Kings Lynn | 47.08 | |||||
1049 | 8049 | 7150 | 67150 | 06/1902 | 10/1949 | Ipswich | 47.33 | 47.45 |