GER/LNER Holden "F6" Class 2-4-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
789 | 7789 | 7218 | 67218 | 12/1904 | 07/1912 from F4 |
10/03/1958 | 12/1948 to F5 |
53.25 | ||||||
800 | 7790 | 7219 | 67219 | 12/1904 | 11/1912 from F4 |
06/11/1956 | 12/1948 to F5 |
51.92 | 52.21 | |||||
61 | 7061 | 7220 | 67220 | 04/1911 | 25/07/1955 | 44.25 | 44.36 | |||||||
62 | 7062 | 7221 | 67221 | 04/1911 | 31/10/1957 | 46.5 | 46.62 | |||||||
63 | 7063 | 7222 | 67222 | 04/1911 | 17/08/1955 | 44.33 | ||||||||
64 | 7064 | 7223 | 67223 | 05/1911 | 13/12/1955 | 44.58 | ||||||||
65 | 7065 | 7224 | 67224 | 05/1911 | 19/11/1956 | 45.5 | ||||||||
66 | 7066 | 7225 | 67225 | 05/1911 | 28/05/1956 | 45 | ||||||||
67 | 7067 | 7226 | 67226 | 05/1911 | 14/11/1955 | 44.5 | ||||||||
68 | 7068 | 7227 | 67227 | 05/1911 | 08/05/1958 | 47 | ||||||||
69 | 7069 | 7228 | 67228 | 06/1911 | 21/04/1958 | 46.83 | ||||||||
70 | 7070 | 7229 | 67229 | 06/1911 | 18/03/1958 | 46.75 | ||||||||
1 | 7001 | 7230 | 67230 | 10/1911 | 13/05/1958 | 46.58 | 47.20 | |||||||
2 | 7002 | 7231 | 67231 | 10/1911 | 14/03/1958 | 46.42 | ||||||||
3 | 7003 | 7232 | 67232 | 11/1911 | 14/11/1955 | 44 | ||||||||
4 | 7004 | 7233 | 67233 | 11/1911 | 13/12/1955 | 44.08 | ||||||||
5 | 7005 | 7234 | 67234 | 11/1911 | 17/08/1956 | 44.75 | ||||||||
6 | 7006 | 7235 | 67235 | 12/1911 | 16/01/1956 | 44.08 | ||||||||
7 | 7007 | 7236 | 67236 | 12/1911 | 17/08/1955 | 43.67 | ||||||||
8 | 7008 | 7237 | 67237 | 01/1912 | 08/1953 | 41.58 | ||||||||
9 | 7009 | 7238 | 67238 | 01/1912 | 07/11/1955 | 43.83 | ||||||||
10 | 7010 | 7239 | 67239 | 01/1912 | 30/12/1955 | 43.92 |