Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 30 Online
» 4920 Today
» 4610 Yesterday
» 4920 Week
» 83855 Month
» 563081 Year
» 3589934 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

GER/LNER Hill "J19" Class 0-6-0


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1240 8240 4640 64640 11/1912 07/1935
from J18
26/11/1959 47
1241 8241 4641 64641 11/1912 10/1936
from J18
25/01/1960 47.17
1242 8242 4642 64642 11/1912 01/1936
from J18
30/03/1960 47.33
1243 8243 4643 64643 11/1912 04/1935
from J18
23/11/1961 49
1244 8244 4644 64644 11/1912 02/1935
from J18
27/07/1959 46.67
1245 8245 4645 64645 11/1912 05/1935
from J18
12/12/1958 46.08
1246 8246 4646 64646 11/1912 11/1935
from J18
26/10/1961 48.92
1247 8247 4647 64647 12/1912 02/1936
from J18
30/03/1960 47.25
1248 8248 4648 64648 12/1912 01/1936
from J18
11/08/1959 46.67
1249 8249 4649 64649 01/1913 05/1935
from J18
01/01/1959 46
1140 8140 4650 64650 08/1916 11/10/1960 44.17
1141 8141 4651 64651 08/1916 01/01/1959 42.42
1142 8142 4652 64652 08/1916 17/01/1961 44.42
1143 8143 4653 64653 09/1916 13/01/1961 44.33
1144 8144 4654 64654 10/1916 25/01/1960 43.25
1145 8145 4655 64655 11/1916 03/08/1961 44.75
1146 8146 4656 64656 11/1916 09/05/1960 43.5
1147 8147 4657 64657 11/1916 16/09/1962 45.83
1148 8148 4658 64658 12/1916 09/11/1959 42.92
1149 8149 4659 64659 01/1917 01/04/1960 43.25
1260 8260 4660 64660 12/1917 29/08/1960 42.67
1261 8261 4661 64661 12/1917 24/08/1959 41.67
1262 8262 4662 64662 01/1918 19/01/1959 41
1263 8263 4663 64663 03/1918 11/10/1960 42.58
1264 8264 4664 64664 09/1918 16/09/1962 44
1265 8265 4665 64665 11/1918 14/12/1959 41.08
1266 8266 4666 64666 11/1918 13/01/1961 42.17
1267 8267 4667 64667 12/1918 10/09/1961 42.75
1268 8268 4668 64668 01/1919 14/12/1959 40.92
1269 8269 4669 64669 03/1919 10/09/1961 42.5
1250 8250 4670 64670 09/1920 24/11/1959 39.17
1251 8251 4671 64671 10/1920 11/02/1962 41.33
1252 8252 4672 64672 10/1920 01/01/1959 38.25
1253 8253 4673 64673 10/1920 06/08/1962 41.83
1254 8254 4674 64674 11/1920 16/01/1961 40.17