Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 32 Online
» 2075 Today
» 3922 Yesterday
» 29597 Week
» 62063 Month
» 264727 Year
» 3291580 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

GER/LNER Holden "J70" Class 0-6-0T


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
135 7135 8216 68216 10/1903 30/11/1953 50.08
136 7136 8217 68217 11/1903 09/03/1953 49.33
137 7137 8218 68218 09/1908 09/1949 Kings Lynn 41
138 7138 09/1908 01/1942 33.33
139 7139 8219 68219 10/1908 31/08/1953 44.83
130 7130 8220 68220 04/1910 23/02/1953 42.83 42.95
127 7127 8221 68221 06/1914 21/05/1951 36.92 36.94
128 7128 8222 68222 06/1914 01/1955 40.58 40.94
131 7131 8223 68223 06/1914 19/07/1955 41.08 41.19
125 7125 8224 68224 03/1921 24/03/1952 31
126 7126 8225 68225 03/1921 08/03/1955 34
129 7129 8226 68226 03/1921 02/08/1955 34.42 34.44