Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 26 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2952 Week
» 4690 Month
» 132133 Year
» 1797509 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "O4" Class 2-8-0


Class Types
GCR Class 8K

General
Designer John Robinson
Introduced 1911
Pre-Grouping Great Central Railway
Big Four London and North Eastern Railway
Description (1957) Classes O4/1, O4/2 and O4/3 Great Central Robinson 4'8" 2-8-0's, built 1911-20. Many of the later ones were built for the Railway Operating Department for service during the First World War and subsequently purchased by the L.N.E.R. between 1924 and 1929. A large number of the class also went overseas during the Second World War (some of them the same engines that saw earlier war service) and these were not returned. Of the 329 locomotives which came into the service of British Railways (including all variations of class O4), all were still in service at the close of 1957, except for 5 which were sold to the War Department in 1952. Some of the unconverted engines have since been rebuilt to classes O4/8 and O1 and their numbers consequently appear again in those sections.

Class O4/6, which is similar to classes O4/1, O4/2 and O4/3 except that they are fitted with side window cabs. They were originally built with larger 5'6" boilers, but were later rebuilt with standard 5'0" boilers in conformity with the rest of the class.

Class O4 rebuilt with G.N.R. O2-type round-topped boiler, but retaining G.C.R. smokebox and chimney.

Classes 04/5 and 04/8. Class 04/5 have G.N.R. O2-type boiler, smokebox and chimney, while class O4/8 have B1-type boiler (see class O1 below) but retain original cylinders and framing.
Wheels 2-8-0
Number Built as O4 402
First in Service 09/1911
Last in Service 17/04/1966
Manufacturers
ManufacturerTotal
Gorton Works 78
Kitson 47
Nasmyth Wilson 14
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow 217
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd 65
Orders
BuilderSponsorOrder #DateSize
Gorton Works  340 01/1911 20
Gorton Works  404 01/1912 10
Kitson  415X 01/1912 20
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Hyde Park)  L496 01/1912 50
Gorton Works  413 01/1913 10
Gorton Works  435 01/1913 16
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd  E104 1917 20
Nasmyth Wilson  L926 1917 24
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Queens Park)  L689 14/02/1917 41
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Hyde Park)  L692 06/06/1917 50
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Queens Park)  L693 06/06/1917 50
Kitson  477Z 1918 12
Kitson  479C 1918 20
Gorton Works  653 1918 6
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd  E105 1918 16
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd  E106 1918 6
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd  E107 1918 12
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Atlas)  L707 1918 14
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Hyde Park)  L703 09/04/1918 30
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Queens Park)  L704 09/04/1918 30
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Hyde Park)  L710 23/08/1918 12
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Queens Park)  L711 23/08/1918 12
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Hyde Park)  L712 24/10/1918 50
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Queens Park)  L713 24/10/1918 50
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow (Atlas)  L714 24/10/1918 30
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd  E108 1919 6
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd  E109 1919 22
Nasmyth Wilson  L1550 1919 8

Illustration
Copyright: BarkingBill
Power
O4/1 O4/2 O4/3 O4/4 O4/5 O4/6 O4/7 O4/8 O4
Variant Introduced 1911 1923 1925 1929 1932 1922 1939 1944 1911
Miscellaneous Differences Ex G.C., 4,000 gallon tender with scoop, vacuum brake for train. Eventually fitted with shorter chimneys, scoop removed Engines cut down to suit NBR load gauge. All transferred to O4/1 in December 1946. Prior to 1925, O4/2 referred to 3 engines with 3,250 gallon tenders. Ex R.O.D. engines purchased by LNER. Similar to O4/1 but without tender scoop and with steam brake only (Westinghouse too when R.O.D.). Merged with O4/1 in December 1940. Rebuilds with O2 type boilers (5' 6" diameter and round top firebox). Frames lengthened at rear end, new cab with single side window, GN type chimney. Rebuilds with shortened barrel version of O2 boiler. Original cab retained. GN type chimney. Conversions from class O5 with standard O4 boiler (from 1922 onwards). Wide cab (some with double side windows) retained. O2 type boiler with shortened barrel and firebox. Original cab retained. GC type chimney. B1 type boiler (5' 6" diameter and round top firebox). New cab with double side windows. GN type chimney.
As O4/1
Tractive Effort 31,326lbs
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Outside Cylinders 21" x 26" (2 off)
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Outside Valves 10"Piston
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Outside Motion Stephenson
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1

Wheels
O4/1 O4/2 O4/3 O4/4 O4/5 O4/6 O4/7 O4/8
Pony 3' 6"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Drivers 4' 8"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Locomotive Wheelbase 25' 5"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Tender Wheelbase 13'
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Total Wheelbase 51' 212"
As O4/1
As O4/1
51' 812"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Descriptive Wheelbase 8' 4" + 5' 8½" + 5' 5½" + 5' 11" + 12' 9½" + (6' 6" + 6' 6") = 51' 2½"
As O4/1
As O4/1
8' 4" + 5' 8½" + 5' 5½" + 5' 11" + 13' 3½" + (6' 6" + 6' 6") = 51' 8½"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1

Dimensions
O4/1 O4/2 O4/3 O4/4 O4/5 O4/6 O4/7 O4/8
Length (over buffers) 61' 812"
As O4/1
As O4/1
62' 212"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Weight (in running order) 121t 10cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
120t 12cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Weight (loco only) 73t 4cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
73t 6cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Adhesive Weight 66t 4cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
66t 6cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Maximum Axle Load 17t 1cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
16t 17cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Water Capacity 4,000gal
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Coal Capacity 6t 0cwt
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1

Boiler & Firebox
O4/1 O4/2 O4/3 O4/4 O4/5 O4/6 O4/7 O4/8 O4
Boiler Diagram 15 15 15 2 15A
As O4/1
15D 100A 15
Boiler Max Diameter 5' 5' 5' 5' 6"
As O4/1
As O4/1
5' 6" 5' 6" 5'
Boiler Barrel Length 15' 15' 15' 16' 138"
As O4/1
As O4/1
8' 13' 1178" 15'
Boiler Pressure 180lbs 180lbs 180lbs 180lbs
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
225lbs 180lbs
Boiler Pitch 8' 612"
As O4/1
As O4/1
735"
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
As O4/1
Firebox Length 8' 6" 8' 6" 8' 6" 9' 6"
As O4/1
As O4/1
9' 9' 8' 6"
Firebox Grate Area 28.24ft2 28.24ft2 28.24ft2 27.5ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
26.1ft2 27.9ft2 28.24ft2
Firebox Heating Surface 154ft2 154ft2 154ft2 163.5ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
163.2ft2 168ft2 154ft2
Tube Number 134 134 134 160
As O4/1
As O4/1
160 141 134
Tube Diameter 2" 2" 2" 2"
As O4/1
As O4/1
2" 2" 2"
Tube Area 1077ft2 1077ft2 1077ft2 1340.5ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
1259.2ft2 1033ft2 1077ft2
Flue Elements 18 18 18 24
As O4/1
As O4/1
24 24 18
Flue Diameter 514" 514" 514" 514"
As O4/1
As O4/1
514" 514" 514"
Flue Area 380ft2 380ft2 380ft2 528ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
495.67ft2 460ft2 380ft2
Total Evaporative Area 1611ft2 1611ft2 1611ft2 2032ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
1918.07ft2 1661ft2 1611ft2
Superheater Elements 18 18 18 24
As O4/1
As O4/1
24 24 18
Superheater Element Diameter 1116" 1116" 1116" 114"
As O4/1
As O4/1
1.244" 1.244" 1116"
Superheater Element Area 198ft2 198ft2 198ft2 430.5ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
400.8ft2 344ft2 198ft2
Total Heating Area 1809ft2 1809ft2 1809ft2 2462.5ft2
As O4/1
As O4/1
2318.67ft2
As O4/1
1809ft2