Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4983 Week
» 16220 Month
» 249140 Year
» 1914516 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Std 4MT" Class 4-6-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
75000 21/05/1951 Swindon 31/12/1965 14.58 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1966 14.91
75001 16/08/1951 Shrewsbury 14/12/1964 13.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 13.67
75002 24/08/1951 Shrewsbury 12/08/1967 16 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 16.53
75003 30/08/1951 Shrewsbury 01/10/1965 14.17 Cut Birds (Bridgend) 02/1966 14.47
75004 27/08/1951 Bristol Bath Road 11/03/1967 15.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1967 15.98
75005 09/09/1951 Shrewsbury 18/11/1965 14.17 Cut Birds (Morriston) 02/1966 14.45
75006 14/09/1951 12/08/1967 15.92 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 16.47
75007 25/09/1951 21/04/1965 13.58 Cut Birds (Bynea) 08/1965 13.90
75008 05/10/1951 31/12/1965 14.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1966 14.54
75009 16/10/1951 03/08/1968 16.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1968 17.10
75010 02/11/1951 14/10/1967 15.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 16.33
75011 12/11/1951 05/11/1966 15 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 02/1967 15.27
75012 19/11/1951 28/01/1967 15.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1967 15.58
75013 11/1951 12/08/1967 15.75 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 16.30
75014 06/12/1951 Patricroft 31/12/1966 15 Prs Preserved
75015 20/12/1951 Southport 30/12/1967 16 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1968 16.50
75016 03/01/1952 Southport 08/07/1967 15.5 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 06/1968 16.46
75017 18/01/1952 Southport 07/01/1967 15 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1967 15.33
75018 07/03/1952 Southport 17/06/1967 15.25 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 11/1967 15.70
75019 21/03/1952 Southport 03/08/1968 16.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1968 16.67
75020 13/11/1953 Oswestry 03/08/1968 14.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1968 15.02
75021 23/11/1953 Cardiff Canton 10/02/1968 14.25 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 06/1968 14.57
75022 02/12/1953 Cardiff Canton 31/12/1965 12 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1966 12.38
75023 03/12/1953 15/01/1966 12.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 12.37
75024 18/12/1953 11/11/1967 Speke Junction 13.92 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 04/1968 14.33
75025 29/04/1954 Laira 31/12/1965 11.67 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1966 11.97
75026 13/05/1954 Laira 30/12/1967 13.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1968 14.18
75027 17/05/1954 Laira 03/08/1968 14.25 Prs Preserved
75028 27/05/1954 11/12/1965 11.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 11.89
75029 28/05/1954 12/08/1967 13.25 Prs Preserved
75030 15/06/1953 Bletchley 30/12/1967 14.5 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1968 15.09
75031 16/06/1953 Bletchley 12/02/1966 12.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1966 12.92
75032 30/06/1953 Bletchley 17/02/1968 14.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1968 14.88
75033 03/07/1953 Bletchley 30/12/1967 14.42 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 06/1968 14.96
75034 07/1953 Bletchley 10/02/1968 14.58 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 07/1968 15.01
75035 13/08/1953 Bletchley 22/07/1967 13.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1968 14.43
75036 14/08/1953 Bletchley 11/06/1966 12.83 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 08/1966 13.01
75037 14/08/1953 Bletchley 30/12/1967 14.33 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 07/1968 14.93
75038 25/08/1953 Bletchley 25/12/1965 12.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 12.65
75039 27/08/1953 Bletchley 23/09/1967 14.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 14.52
75040 02/09/1953 Bedford 21/10/1967 14.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1968 14.54
75041 10/09/1953 Bedford 27/01/1968 14.33 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 08/1968 14.94
75042 11/09/1953 Bedford 04/11/1967 14.17 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 03/1968 14.52
75043 17/09/1953 Bedford 30/12/1967 14.25 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 04/1968 14.59
75044 09/1953 Bedford 12/03/1966 12.5 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 06/1966 12.76
75045 28/09/1953 Accrington 23/04/1966 12.58 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 08/1966 12.89
75046 05/10/1953 Accrington 12/08/1967 13.83 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 14.41
75047 16/10/1953 Accrington 12/08/1967 13.83 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 14.38
75048 23/10/1953 Accrington 03/08/1968 14.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1968 15.07
75049 10/1953 Accrington 08/10/1966 13 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1967 13.42
75050 09/11/1956 Llandudno Junction 26/11/1966 10 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 06/1967 10.60
75051 27/11/1956 Chester (MR) 29/10/1966 9.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 02/1967 10.22
75052 20/12/1956 Bletchley 12/08/1967 10.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 11.20
75053 01/1957 Chester (MR) 10/09/1966 9.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1967 10.09
75054 17/01/1957 Chester (MR) 27/08/1966 9.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 10.00
75055 23/01/1957 Bedford 27/05/1967 10.33 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 28/02/1968 11.10
75056 28/02/1957 Nottingham 11/06/1966 9.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 08/1966 9.47
75057 03/1957 Leicester Midland 12/02/1966 8.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1966 9.26
75058 08/04/1957 Leicester Midland 30/12/1967 10.67 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 04/1968 11.03
75059 15/04/1957 Leicester Midland 22/07/1967 10.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1967 10.67
75060 02/05/1957 Leicester Midland 22/04/1967 9.92 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1967 10.46
75061 15/05/1957 Leicester Midland 04/02/1967 9.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 06/1967 10.09
75062 28/05/1957 10/02/1968 10.75 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 06/1968 11.06
75063 13/06/1957 Nottingham 28/05/1966 8.92 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 08/1966 9.18
75064 26/06/1957 Nottingham 20/05/1967 9.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 10.23
75065 26/08/1955 Dover Marine 04/09/1966 11.08 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1966 11.31
75066 01/09/1955 Dover Marine 02/1966 10.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 10.63
75067 12/09/1955 Dover Marine 04/10/1964 9.08 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 11/1965 10.18
75068 15/09/1955 Dover Marine 02/07/1967 11.83 Cut Birds (Risca) 28/02/1968 12.46
75069 28/09/1955 Dover Marine 25/09/1966 11 Prs Preserved
75070 13/10/1955 Exmouth Junction 11/09/1966 10.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 11.43
75071 26/10/1955 Exmouth Junction 12/08/1967 11.83 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 12.35
75072 01/11/1955 Exmouth Junction 31/12/1965 10.08 Cut T W Ward (Ringwood) 04/1966 10.46
75073 30/11/1955 Exmouth Junction 31/12/1965 10.08 Cut T W Ward (Ringwood) 04/1966 10.38
75074 18/11/1955 Exmouth Junction 09/07/1967 11.67 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 10/1967 11.92
75075 25/11/1955 Exmouth Junction 09/07/1967 11.67 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 10/1967 11.90
75076 09/12/1955 Exmouth Junction 09/07/1967 11.58 Cut Birds (Risca) 12/1967 12.02
75077 29/12/1955 Exmouth Junction 09/07/1967 11.58 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 10/1967 11.80
75078 20/01/1956 Exmouth Junction 10/07/1966 10.5 Prs Preserved
75079 20/01/1956 Exmouth Junction 20/11/1966 10.83 Prs Preserved