Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2309 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15715 Week
» 68731 Month
» 188258 Year
» 3215111 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1004 |
12/05/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
12/05/1962 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/1973 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
11 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,088,000 miles |
Cut Up |
19/09/1974 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
12/05/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
08/02/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
13/08/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
13/08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1004, name: WESTERN CRUSADER Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
08/02/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
13/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
13/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
01/08/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1004 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
19/09/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|