Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2100 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19903 Week
» 72919 Month
» 192446 Year
» 3219299 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1015 |
21/01/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
21/01/1963 to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
Withdrawn |
13/12/1976 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,296,000 miles |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GOP1 |
Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt - also, at 'A' end only, yellow bands extending around the cabsides - never ran in BR service in this livery. |
21/01/1963 |
GOP2 |
Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt. |
25/01/1963 |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
08/11/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
08/11/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/11/1968 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
08/11/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
09/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1015, name: WESTERN CHAMPION Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) Livery applied: Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt - also, at 'A' end only, yellow bands extending around the cabsides - never ran in BR service in this livery. |
|
|
25/01/1963 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Golden Ochre with yellow panels not reaching the bottom skirt. |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
08/11/1965 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/11/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
05/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
13/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1015 from Laira (84A) |
|
|