|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brighton Works | 20/10/1952 | n/a | 22/01/1953 | Heavy Intermediate | 80 days | 80 days | £1,782.00 | |||||
Brighton Works | 17/03/1953 | 54 days | 24/03/1953 | Light Casual | 2 days | 4 days | 6 days | £143.00 | ||||
Brighton Works | 15/07/1953 | 113 days | 31/07/1953 | Light Casual Fire damage |
14 days | 14 days | ||||||
Brighton Works | 05/09/1953 | 36 days | 07/10/1953 | Heavy Intermediate | 1 day | 26 days | 27 days | £1,308.00 | ||||
Brighton Works | 22/02/1954 | 138 days | 25/06/1954 | Heavy Intermediate | 105 days | 105 days | £3,670.00 | |||||
Peckham Rye | 22/11/1954 | 150 days | 01/12/1954 | Non Classified | 8 days | 8 days | ||||||
Brighton Works | 01/01/1955 | 31 days | 10/03/1955 | Heavy Casual | 2 days | 56 days | 58 days | £1,457.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 10/05/1955 | 61 days | 16/05/1955 | Non Classified | 5 days | 5 days | ||||||
Crewe Works | 01/09/1955 | 108 days | 23/09/1955 | Light Casual | 1 day | 18 days | 19 days | £434.00 | ||||
Crewe Works | 27/09/1955 | 4 days | 12/10/1955 | Non Classified Rectification |
13 days | 13 days | ||||||
Derby Works | 08/11/1955 | 27 days | 10/08/1956 | Heavy General | 3 days | 2 days | 229 days | 234 days | £13,208.00 | |||
Derby Works | 23/10/1956 | 74 days | 28/12/1956 | Heavy Casual | 11 days | 44 days | 55 days | £1,861.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 11/05/1957 | 134 days | 20/05/1957 | Light Casual | 1 day | 6 days | 7 days | £1,086.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 23/05/1957 | 3 days | 27/05/1957 | Non Classified Rectification |
3 days | 3 days | ||||||
Derby Works | 11/06/1957 | 15 days | 05/07/1957 | Heavy Casual | 3 days | 18 days | 21 days | £1,962.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 18/09/1957 | 75 days | 27/09/1957 | Light Casual | 1 day | 7 days | 8 days | £675.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 11/03/1958 | 165 days | 14/05/1958 | Heavy Casual | 5 days | 49 days | 54 days | £3,297.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 06/08/1958 | 84 days | 22/08/1958 | Non Classified | 4 days | 10 days | 14 days | £681.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 02/09/1958 | 11 days | 17/09/1958 | Non Classified Rectification |
5 days | 8 days | 13 days | |||||
Derby Works | 06/10/1958 | 19 days | 29/10/1958 | Non Classified | 6 days | 14 days | 20 days | £171.00 | ||||
Derby Works | 02/09/1959 | 308 days | 27/11/1959 | Heavy Casual | 74 days | 74 days | £5,400.00 |
Year | Annual Mileage | Cumulative Mileage | Fuel Oil Utilised | Approximate Miles/Gallon | Classified Wait Repair | Classified Wait Works | Classified On Works | Classified Total (Wkdys) | Running Repairs | Running Repair & Exams Cost | Wkdys Not Required for Service | Wkdys Stored Serviceable | Wkdys Stored Unserviceable | Total Weekdays Unavailable |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1950 | 773 | 773 | 860g | 0.9 | 1 | 1 | ||||||||
1951 | 2,508 | 3,281 | 2,525g | 0.99 | 41 | £289 | 256 | 297 | ||||||
1952 | 114,052 | 117,333 | 126,840g | 0.9 | 1 | 74 | 75 | 51 | £4,134 | 1 | 127 | |||
1953 | 119,433 | 236,766 | 135,732g | 0.88 | 1 | 67 | 68 | 29 | £3,022 | 9 | 106 | |||
1954 | 95,689 | 332,455 | 112,520g | 0.85 | 1 | 105 | 106 | 39 | £2,220 | 2 | 147 | |||
1955 | 42,842 | 375,297 | 47,674g | 0.9 | 4 | 3 | 127 | 134 | 28 | £2,684 | 20 | 182 | ||
1956 | 13,424 | 388,721 | 14,490g | 0.93 | 11 | 233 | 244 | 10 | £835 | 8 | 262 | |||
1957 | 146,370 | 535,091 | 5 | 34 | 39 | 41 | £2,674 | 2 | 82 | |||||
1958 | 79,791 | 614,882 | 84,013g | 0.95 | 10 | 57 | 67 | 64 | £2,416 | 131 | ||||
1959 | 46,534 | 661,416 | 50,492g | 0.92 | 74 | 74 | 80 | £1,142 | 19 | 173 | ||||
1960 | 46,699 | 708,115 | 55,364g | 0.84 | 123 | £1,855 | 123 | |||||||
1961 | 33,311 | 741,426 | 116 | £839 | 2 | 118 | ||||||||
1962 | 8,006 | 749,432 | 67 | 67 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/12/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways number 10201 Built at Ashford Works |
||
20/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
19/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) | ||
22/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 22/01/1953. Stopped on 20/10/1952 |
||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 24/03/1953. Stopped on 17/03/1953 |
||
31/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 31/07/1953. Stopped on 15/07/1953 Work undertaken: Fire damage |
||
07/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 07/10/1953. Stopped on 05/09/1953 |
||
01/11/1953 | Works Visit | Depot Repair - Bricklayers Arms (Light Casual) - Dep: 01/11/1953. Stopped on 30/10/1953 |
||
25/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Dep: 25/06/1954. Stopped on 22/02/1954 |
||
01/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Peckham Rye (Non Classified) - Dep: 01/12/1954. Stopped on 22/11/1954 |
||
10/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 10/03/1955. Stopped on 01/01/1955 |
||
02/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
16/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 16/05/1955. Stopped on 10/05/1955 |
||
23/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 23/09/1955. Stopped on 01/09/1955 |
||
12/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 12/10/1955. Stopped on 27/09/1955 Work undertaken: Rectification |
||
10/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Dep: 10/08/1956. Stopped on 08/11/1955 |
||
28/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 28/12/1956. Stopped on 23/10/1956 |
||
31/12/1956 | Modification | Modification: Alterations to Housing Roof | ||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 20/05/1957. Stopped on 11/05/1957 |
||
27/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 27/05/1957. Stopped on 23/05/1957 Work undertaken: Rectification |
||
05/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 05/07/1957. Stopped on 11/06/1957 |
||
27/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 27/09/1957. Stopped on 18/09/1957 |
||
14/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 14/05/1958. Stopped on 11/03/1958 |
||
22/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 22/08/1958. Stopped on 06/08/1958 |
||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 17/09/1958. Stopped on 02/09/1958 Work undertaken: Rectification |
||
29/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 29/10/1958. Stopped on 06/10/1958 |
||
21/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
27/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 27/11/1959. Stopped on 02/09/1959 |
||
15/10/1962 | To Store | To Store ( at Derby Works) | ||
07/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 10201 | ||
01/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |