Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1420 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19223 Week
» 72239 Month
» 191766 Year
» 3218619 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1036 |
29/08/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
29/08/1962 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1976 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
14 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,360,000 miles |
Cut Up |
24/02/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/08/1962 |
BSYP |
BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
25/11/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
03/11/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/03/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/03/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
08/03/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
24/05/1963 |
|
Handsworth & Smethwick Station |
Royal Train ecs |
1X00 |
Alex Lawson, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1036, name: WESTERN EMPEROR Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
25/11/1966 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/11/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
01/11/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1036 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
24/02/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|