Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2144 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15550 Week
» 68566 Month
» 188093 Year
» 3214946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1040 |
20/09/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
20/09/1962 to Old Oak Common (81A) |
Withdrawn |
29/02/1976 off Laira (LA) |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,248,000 miles |
Cut Up |
11/08/1976 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MNP |
Maroon bodywork including front of cab. |
20/09/1962 |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
21/06/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
17/04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
16/11/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
16/11/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1040, name: WESTERN QUEEN Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
21/06/1963 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
17/04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
16/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1975 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1040 from Laira (LA) |
|
|
11/08/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|