Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1785 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19588 Week
» 72604 Month
» 192131 Year
» 3218984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1058 |
25/03/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
25/03/1963 to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
Withdrawn |
24/01/1977 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
13 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,312,000 miles |
Cut Up |
30/06/1979 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
25/03/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
01/11/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/02/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
15/02/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/03/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
15/02/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1058, name: WESTERN NOBLEMAN Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
01/11/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
15/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
24/01/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1058 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
30/06/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|