Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19105 Week
» 72121 Month
» 191648 Year
» 3218501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D107 |
20/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45120 |
13/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
20/07/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
24/03/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
19/05/1993 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
17/05/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
17/05/1971 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
01/09/1964 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
20/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
28/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D107 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/05/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
13/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45120 |
|
|
24/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45120 |
|
|
19/05/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|