Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 245 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1946 Week
» 10061 Month
» 137504 Year
» 1802880 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7289 m/e 10/1924
British Railways 47289 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 10/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1967
Service Life 43 yrs , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1924
9B   Stockport Edgeley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8A   Edge Hill w/e 07/11/1959
8L   Aintree w/e 04/07/1964
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 19/11/1966
16G   Westhouses (Reinstated) w/e 04/02/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3w/e 03/12/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966
REINS 16G Westhouses w/e 04/02/1967
WDN   w/e 07/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
03/07/1958 Derby Works (stripping) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. SLS/196204
16/09/1967 L.M.S.R. 3F 0-6-0Ts. On 16th September, 47383 was on Westhouses shed and 47629 an 47289 were at Williamthorpe Colliery. The other spare engine for the Colliery working kept at Westhouses was J94 68012, whilst withdrawn 47313 was still at Westhouses. SLS/196710
04/10/1967 Last Standard Guage tanks withdrawn The last of the standard gauge tanks in Great Britain were taken out of traffic from 4th October viz. J94 68012 and LMS 0-6-0Ts 47289, 47383 an 47629. Just prior to that date, 47629 and 68012 had been working at Williamthorpe Colliery Derbyshire with the other two spare at Westhouses shed; now all four stand together at Westhouses shed. NCB diesel (English Electric D1196 of 1967) 0-6-0 has taken over work at the Colliery. Now only the 5' 3' gauge tanks remain in N. Ireland and the narrow gauge tanks of the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth. SLS/196711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1924 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7289
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 47289    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
19/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
04/02/1967 Reinstated Reinstated to Westhouses (16G)    
07/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 47289    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev