Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 409 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5396 Week
» 13511 Month
» 140954 Year
» 1806330 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7305 m/e 02/1925
British Railways 47305 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/02/1965
Service Life 40 yrs , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1925
21C   Bromsgrove on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 29/12/1956
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/02/1957
12C   Barrow in Furness w/e 04/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 12C Barrow in Furness 4w/e 04/04/1964
WDN   w/e 27/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/06/1950 Derby Works Engines into works: 60, 40063, 656, 41043, 41064, 1341, 41535, 41904, 42340, 42377, 43203, 43310, 3511, 4179, 44241, 44555, 58070, 64784, 64841, 64797, 64903 and pannier tank 2070. A number of J.39's are now shopped at Derby. Ex works in lined black with emblem 40007, 40409, 40586, 41117: un-lined ditto 47292, 47305, 47432, 43521, 43960, 44136, 43657, 12024, 2182 (pannier tank), 41779 (retaining R.T. Firebox and Salter safety-valves), still lettered L.M.S. 40700, 41078, 43978, 58240 (retaining round-topped firebox and Salter safety-valves). Cut up between 31/5/50 and 16/6/50: 40516, 2096 (Tilbury Tank), 3805 (3F). New Construction: Ulster Transport Authority Nos. 54 and 55 completed; 56 boiler fitted; 57 frames only. B.R. 42145 completed; 42146 frames only; 12069/70 ex works. Running trials: 10800 0-4-4-0 Diesel, N.B. Loco. Co. 26413/50; Davey-Paxman Diesel engine, electrical equipment by B.T.H. Co. SLS/195008
13/04/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D210/69, D2501/8, D2903/9, D3126/72, D8006, 11116, 12077, 13119, 13245. Test House: ED2, D24/7, D76, D83, D255/68, D2910, D5015/61/89, D5140, 10203, 11114. New Building: D28-37, Finishing Shop: D74, D223/92, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42077, 42092, 42367, 42414/39, 42522, 43972, 44102, 44284, 44538, 44603, 47675, 48114, 48220/4, 48447, 48695, 53806, 73014/39, 73126/7. Paint Shop: D26, D78, M1000, 44177, 47278, 47318, 48143. In Works Sidings: D68, D86, D88, D3069, D5701, 12000, 41529/36, 41835, 42281, 44067/85/91, 44195, 44269, 47305/24/90, 47533, 48003, 48121, 48336, 48666, 58850, 73157. Ex-Works Shed: D79, D230, D3052, 47415/39, 48063, 48153, 48219, 48690. SLS/196105
15/05/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7305
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bromsgrove (21C)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47305    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
04/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
27/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 47305    
04/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev