Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 329 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2030 Week
» 10145 Month
» 137588 Year
» 1802964 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7478 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 47478 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/04/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1928
4C   Swansea (Upper Bank) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
  Wolverton Works w/e 03/10/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 24/02/1962
  Wolverton Works w/e 17/03/1962
2B   Nuneaton w/e 07/07/1962
5C   Stafford w/e 06/04/1963
2B   Nuneaton w/e 25/05/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC WW   5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 99W Wolverton Works 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 11/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/10/1959 Wolverton Works Caledonian Ry. 56325 was on loan here from 4th Sept.-23rd Sept.; the latest arrivals are the motor-fitted standard tanks ex Swansea Vic., viz., 47478/9 (latterly stored at Neath). 40006 an 47500 officially returned to their respective sheds (1A and 1E) are still at the Works here. SLS/195912
18/08/1962 Rugby MPD Electric engine E2001 (ex 18000) is here for instructional purposes; motor-fitted 'Jinties' 47477/8 have been transferred to Nuneaton in exchange for 47294 an 47385 which have been sent to Wolverton Works. They are, however, stored. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7478
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47478    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wolverton Works ()    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wolverton Works ()    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 47478    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev