Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 327 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2028 Week
» 10143 Month
» 137586 Year
» 1802962 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7479 m/e 01/1928
British Railways 47479 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/08/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1928
4C   Swansea (Upper Bank) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5B   Crewe South w/e 25/12/1948
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
  Wolverton Works w/e 03/10/1959
5B   Crewe South w/e 24/02/1962
  Wolverton Works w/e 17/03/1962
2B   Nuneaton w/e 07/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 04/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC WW   5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 99W Wolverton Works 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 04/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102
22/10/1959 Wolverton Works Caledonian Ry. 56325 was on loan here from 4th Sept.-23rd Sept.; the latest arrivals are the motor-fitted standard tanks ex Swansea Vic., viz., 47478/9 (latterly stored at Neath). 40006 an 47500 officially returned to their respective sheds (1A and 1E) are still at the Works here. SLS/195912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7479
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C)    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47479    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wolverton Works ()    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wolverton Works ()    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
04/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 47479    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev