Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7493 m/e 02/1928
British Railways 47493 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 38 yrs , 11 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
13B   Devons Road (Bow) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8C   Speke Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954
26A   Newton Heath w/e 13/12/1958
8C   Speke Junction w/e 14/03/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 21/07/1962
8A   Edge Hill w/e 04/09/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 27/11/1954
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 27/12/1958
EXLOAN 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 5w/e 11/09/1965
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/05/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7493
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Devons Road (Bow) (13B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47493    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
04/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47493    

prev prev