Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 578 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3504 Week
» 5242 Month
» 132685 Year
» 1798061 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7517 m/e 02/1928
British Railways 47517 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/06/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
13B   Devons Road (Bow) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11A   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 06/09/1958
26A   Newton Heath w/e 13/12/1958
11A   Barrow in Furness w/e 14/03/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 27/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11A Barrow in Furness 4w/e 06/09/1958
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 27/12/1958
EXLOAN 11A Barrow in Furness 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 27/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/08/1958 Devons Road MPD 47517 was the last steam engine here-it left for Barrow, 25th August, following the arrival of D2907. SLS/195810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7517
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Devons Road (Bow) (13B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 47517    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11A)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11A)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
27/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 47517    
10/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev