Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 277 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1978 Week
» 10093 Month
» 137536 Year
» 1802912 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7566 m/e 05/1928
British Railways 47566 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
To Service During 05/1928
Withdrawal During 10/1966
Service Life 38 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1928
16B   Spital Bridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 21/02/1953
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 03/11/1956
8L   Aintree w/e 04/07/1964
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 8E Brunswick 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 8E Brunswick 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 05/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1950 Inter regional allocations The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). SLS/195012
18/06/1967 Crewe South MPD (condemned or waiting Works) Stored-LNER 4498, 44843, 45042, 45243/64/98, 45353/91, 45494; condemned or waiting Works-43024/34, 44666/85, 44737/79, 44800/12/4/60/5, 45006/33, 45197, 45446, 47566, 48011/449/502/548/705, 71000, 78036, 92032. SLS/196708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7566
Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd.
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47566    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
10/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47566    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev