Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 335 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2036 Week
» 10151 Month
» 137594 Year
» 1802970 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 7655 m/e 03/1929
British Railways 47655 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
To Service During 03/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/11/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1929
4C   Swansea (Upper Bank) 4w/e 22/06/1946
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 30/11/1957
27B   Aintree w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 13/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/04/1946
LOAN 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 13/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/06/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D8, D268, D2503, D2912, D3017, D5022/91, 11114, 12033/52. Diesel Test House: D27, D35, D215, D5031/2/4/85, D8013. New Shunter Test House: D3119. New Building: D38-D42, D44-D45, D47, D49. Finishing Shop: D36, D37. D43, D72, D5018/90. Erecting Shop: D2501, D3181, 12069, 42070/5/88, 42529, 43918/28, 44295, 44597, 47201, 47655, 48006, 48140, 48182, 48333/64, 48407, 48645/99, 48750, 73128, 75037/40/58. New Paint Shop: D34, MR 1000, 44045, 44533, 48748. In Works Sidings:-D11, D75, D77. D84, D92, D223, D306, D3058, D5061, D5139, 13122, 41529, 41835, 42307/37, 42506/7/10, 43846, 43911/21/47, 44132/3, 44333/62, 44520, 47393, 47418, 48177, 48351, 58850, 73014. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 7655
Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 47655    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
13/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 47655    
03/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev