Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2250 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20053 Week
» 73069 Month
» 192596 Year
» 3219449 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3836 |
m/e |
11/1911 |
British Railways |
43836 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 11/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 11/07/1959 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1911 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3836 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Belle Vue (19E) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43836 |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43836 |
|
|