Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1051 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15094 Week
» 80048 Month
» 282712 Year
» 3309565 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3843 |
y/e |
1917 |
British Railways |
43843 |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1917 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/05/1960 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 12/11/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1917 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3843 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43843 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43843 |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|