Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 585 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3511 Week
» 5249 Month
» 132692 Year
» 1798068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3859 y/e 1918
British Railways 43859 w/e 28/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1918
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/03/1962
Service Life 44 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1918
16B   Spital Bridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A   Toton w/e 02/10/1948
17A   Derby m/e 30/11/1950
17A   Derby 4w/e 02/12/1950
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 13/08/1955
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 28/12/1957
16A   Nottingham 4w/e 06/09/1958
14B   Kentish Town w/e 18/06/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 17A Derby m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   w/e 17/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Belle Vue MPD The following interesting visitors were noted during January: 2829 (21A); 3319 (16B); 3982 (15A); 3615 (4A); 4853 (20A), 5298 (8A); 12861 (23B). During February: 3231 (20G); 3335 (20G); 3454 (15D); 3620 (21A); 3859 (16B); 4045 (22B); 4186 (21A); 4292 (11E). On 9/2 6132 (20A) passed through on an express travelling in the direction of Manchester Victoria. SLS/194604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1918 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3859
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
28/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43859    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    
03/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 43859    

prev prev