Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3969 y/e 1922
British Railways 43969 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal Sat 14/09/1963
Service Life 41 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1922
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16A   Nottingham w/e 06/08/1949
19C   Canklow w/e 11/02/1950
22A   Bristol Barrow Road w/e 11/03/1950
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/07/1950
22A   Bristol Barrow Road w/e 12/08/1950
18A   Toton 4w/e 07/10/1950
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield m/e 16/06/1956
17A   Derby 4w/e 11/08/1956
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 22/08/1959
18A   Toton w/e 27/01/1962
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 10/03/1962
18A   Toton w/e 01/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 14/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 16B Spital Bridge w/e 21/06/1947
EXLOAN 16A Nottingham w/e 20/09/1947
ALLOC 16A Nottingham w/e 06/08/1949
ALLOC 19C Canklow w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 11/03/1950
LOAN 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 29/04/1950
ALLOC 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/07/1950
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 18A Toton w/e 07/10/1950
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 14/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3969
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 43969    
06/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (19C)    
11/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
08/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
22/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
10/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
14/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 43969    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev