Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 16 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4643 Week
» 6381 Month
» 133824 Year
» 1799200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3975 y/e 1922
British Railways 43975 w/e 15/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal Sat 16/01/1965
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1922
18A   Toton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15A   Wellingborough w/e 17/01/1948
17A   Derby 8w/e 29/11/1952
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 21/02/1953
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 02/01/1954
17C   Coalville 8w/e 05/10/1957
21A   Saltley w/e 09/01/1960
16A   Nottingham w/e 20/01/1962
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 08/12/1962
16D   Nottingham w/e 28/12/1963
10G   Skipton w/e 07/11/1964
     Withdrawn on 16/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 17/01/1948
LOAN 16B Spital Bridge w/e 19/06/1948
LOAN 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 17/07/1948
EXLOAN 15A Wellingborough w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 17C Coalville 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 10G Skipton 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 16/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/11/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, SLS/195812
05/11/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. SLS/196112
17/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3975
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
15/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43975    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
02/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (17C)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
20/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
16/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 43975    
05/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev