Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 38 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4665 Week
» 6403 Month
» 133846 Year
» 1799222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 3977 y/e 1922
British Railways 43977 w/e 25/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal Sat 09/11/1963
Service Life 41 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1922
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18B   Westhouses w/e 14/08/1948
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 21/08/1948
15B   Kettering 4w/e 22/03/1952
15A   Wellingborough 4w/e 06/09/1952
15F   Market Harborough w/e 02/04/1960
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 24/09/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 22/07/1961
18A   Toton w/e 01/06/1963
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 09/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18B Westhouses w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 15B Kettering 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 15F Market Harborough 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 09/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102
17/12/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-44418 cut up, D2395, D3181, D4106/34. D5384, 12005/31/66, ED5; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D69, D75, D83, D5007/19/23/78, D5142, D5382/402, 10001; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5244-57 new. Erecting Shop: D1, D40/4, D84/6, D93, D102/10/23/31/45, D3126. Test House: D76, D106/21/38, D150, D3082, D5236/8/40/1/2. Paint Shop: D1698, D5239, 12059. Finishing Shop: D65, D101/18, D5237/43. Klondyke: D155, D5197/235, ED4. Foundry Row: 42310, 42500, 43977, 44085, 44530, 47496, D47, D2220, D3122. Stone Pit: D5233. Stored: 10000, 10201-3. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3977
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
14/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
21/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
25/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43977    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Market Harborough (15F)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
09/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 43977    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev