Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3988 |
y/e |
1921 |
British Railways |
43988 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 10/10/1964 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1921 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3988 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43988 |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
28/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15C) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43988 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|