Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4202 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17608 Week
» 70624 Month
» 190151 Year
» 3217004 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4021 |
y/e |
1922 |
British Railways |
44021 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/12/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
4w/e |
10/07/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1922 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4021 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44021 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44021 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|