Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 4023 y/e 1922
British Railways 44023 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/12/1964
Service Life 43 yrs , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) y/e 1922
17A   Derby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley w/e 04/09/1948
17A   Derby 4w/e 04/12/1954
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 21/05/1955
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 25/07/1959
17A   Derby w/e 13/10/1962
16F   Burton w/e 16/11/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 26/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 05/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 02/03/1946
LOAN 21A Saltley w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 16F Burton 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 05/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
24/10/1948 Bath Green Park Locomotives at Bath from other sheds on 24/10 included Nos. 43627 (21A), M4023 (21A), 44425 (16C) and 58080-ex 1411 (22A). Of the S. & D. 2-8-0's, only three retain the 5' 3' type G9B boilers -Nos. 13806/07/08; the remainder have the smaller G9A type. Two have been re-numbered-Nos. 53802/04. SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4023
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
23/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44023    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
16/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
05/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44023    
02/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev