Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 1102 m/e 10/1925
British Railways 41102 w/e 21/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Derby Works
Order Number 6293
To Service During 10/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/12/1958
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1925
24A   Accrington on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25C   Goole w/e 01/10/1949
27C   Southport w/e 10/06/1950
27C   Southport 2w/e 17/06/1950
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 30/09/1950
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 07/10/1950
35C   Spital Bridge 5w/e 23/06/1951
35C   Spital Bridge 4w/e 21/07/1951
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 11/08/1951
27C   Southport 4w/e 22/03/1952
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 01/11/1952
27E   Walton on the Hill 8w/e 29/11/1952
27C   Southport 8w/e 11/07/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 31/10/1953
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 24/04/1954
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 17/07/1954
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 22/03/1958
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 14/06/1958
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 04/10/1958
17A   Derby w/e 08/11/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 20/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 27C Southport w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 30/09/1950
LOAN 35C Spital Bridge w/e 30/06/1951
EXLOAN 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   w/e 20/12/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1925 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1102
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A)    
21/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41102    
01/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
08/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
20/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 41102    
06/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev