Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 264 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1965 Week
» 10080 Month
» 137523 Year
» 1802899 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 1188 m/e 03/1927
British Railways 41188 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class Compound
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 03/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/11/1955
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1927
23A   Bank Hall on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24A   Accrington 3w/e 11/12/1948
27E   Walton on the Hill w/e 21/10/1950
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 04/11/1950
35C   Spital Bridge 5w/e 21/06/1952
27E   Walton on the Hill 4w/e 04/10/1952
27B   Aintree 4w/e 31/10/1953
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 24/04/1954
24E   Blackpool Central 8w/e 19/06/1954
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 01/01/1955
24A   Accrington 4w/e 23/04/1955
24D   Lower Darwen 8w/e 16/07/1955
     Withdrawn w/e 19/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23A Bank Hall w/e 22/11/1947
LOAN 24A Accrington w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 21/10/1950
LOAN 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 04/10/1952
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   w/e 19/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003
28/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. SLS/195004
05/04/1954 Leeds-Northallerton As from 5/4/54 a Farnley Junction (25G) engine has taken over the working of the 3.50 p.m. Leeds City to Northallerton (via Wetherby) and the 8.42 p.m. Northallerton to Leeds City (via Arthington). The engine provided is normally a Stanier Class 5 4-6-0, but towards the end of April a Compound, 41188 (27B), contrived to get into this diagram and after several days of indifferent performance failed at Pickhill on the down journey on 27/4/54; it was replaced for the remainder of the day by a Starbeck (50D) J39, and on the next day by 45075 (25G). SLS/195406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1188
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41188    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
11/1955 Scrapped Scrapped    
19/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 41188    

prev prev