Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 14 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4641 Week
» 6379 Month
» 133822 Year
» 1799198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 1535 m/e 02/1922
British Railways 41535 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Deeley
Class 0F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-4-0T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1922
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1922
17A   Derby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
22B   Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 18/05/1957
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 28/09/1963
87A   Neath (Court Sart) 7w/e 22/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock on 16/09/1963
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/06/1950 Derby Works Engines into works: 60, 40063, 656, 41043, 41064, 1341, 41535, 41904, 42340, 42377, 43203, 43310, 3511, 4179, 44241, 44555, 58070, 64784, 64841, 64797, 64903 and pannier tank 2070. A number of J.39's are now shopped at Derby. Ex works in lined black with emblem 40007, 40409, 40586, 41117: un-lined ditto 47292, 47305, 47432, 43521, 43960, 44136, 43657, 12024, 2182 (pannier tank), 41779 (retaining R.T. Firebox and Salter safety-valves), still lettered L.M.S. 40700, 41078, 43978, 58240 (retaining round-topped firebox and Salter safety-valves). Cut up between 31/5/50 and 16/6/50: 40516, 2096 (Tilbury Tank), 3805 (3F). New Construction: Ulster Transport Authority Nos. 54 and 55 completed; 56 boiler fitted; 57 frames only. B.R. 42145 completed; 42146 frames only; 12069/70 ex works. Running trials: 10800 0-4-4-0 Diesel, N.B. Loco. Co. 26413/50; Davey-Paxman Diesel engine, electrical equipment by B.T.H. Co. SLS/195008
31/08/1950 Derby Works For works: 12000, 40012/51/8, 40353, 414, 40498, 40515, 527, 40567, 684, 40917/26/8, 41017/58/72/7/81, 41124/60/9, 41710, 1748, 41961, 42508/15, 3099, 43216/24, 3271, 43283, 3484, 43538, 3738/59/60, 43835/54/62, 43909/16/29/94, 44020/45/94/6, 44137, 44414/33/75, 44566, 47220, 7237, 47287, 7324, 47356, 7395, 7403/5/17/51, 47506, 7507,7542/81, 58033, 1406, 58080, 58224, W.2108 and 'J.39' 4721/37/85, 64980, 4956. Ex Works: 42146, UTA.57, 12070-3 (new): and after repair 40410, 40535/56, 40929, 41088, 41535, 41672, 41752, 41889, 42353, 42510, 43224, 43446, 43574, 43690, 44127/37/90, 44242, 44362, 44414/72, 44521, 47280, 47342/56/65, 47426, 47526, 58220/4/9, 64762/84/97, 64960 and 2097. New Construction, in various stages 2-6-4T 42050-4 (Order 4310) and D/E 12074/5 almost complete. Being cut up 41034, 58036 (24/8). The works yard contained 22853, 43818, 43297, 41017, 3511, 40515 (all condemned) and 58033, 1406, 40498 (under consideration). SLS/195012
17/03/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor MPD (Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay) In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. SLS/196304
11/04/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay) Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. SLS/196304
27/04/1963 Birmingham Excursions (Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay) On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. SLS/196304
24/03/1963 Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. SLS/196304
15/05/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. SLS/196304
16/06/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196307
15/08/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41535, 75011/042/050, D2504, D2508, D2911, D3024/54/249/91; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D13, D69, D5015/28/81, D49, D72, D80/1, D91, D131/41/54/5, D5030/5. Test House: D7, D14, D47, D133/4/9; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5233-7, D7568-77 new. Diesel Shop: D6, D11, D37, D58, D90/2, D105, D5010/92/221. Paint Shop: 75012, D5220. Finishing Shop: D67/8, D79, D5008, D5204/22. Stone Pit: 44433, 48105. Foundry Row: 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 63658, 73067/090. Yard: D2, D3, D43, D59, D93, D114/5/20/49, D2221, D2902/7, D5027/76/82, D5395, ED4, ED7. As Derby is expected to cease steam repairs shortly, several engines have been sent to Crewe for repair/scrap. SLS/196309
23/10/1963 Worcester Works 41535 (transferred to Swansea E. Dock) arrived on 23rd October. SLS/196311
15/12/1963 Worcester Works 1000, 2232, 4978, 6956, 7002, 41535. In store at shed: 3207, 5022, 7023/31. Great Bridge: (5930 and 7007 were removed to Great Bridge for scrap on 5th December). SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1922 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1535
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41535    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41535    
11/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev