Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 20 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4647 Week
» 6385 Month
» 133828 Year
» 1799204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 47006 on 06/11/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Class 0F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-4-0ST
Builder Horwich Works
To Service Sat 06/11/1953 to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/08/1966
Service Life 12 yrs , 9 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) on 06/11/1953
6H   Bangor 4w/e 10/08/1957
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 29/11/1958
8D   Widnes w/e 20/06/1959
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 22/08/1959
17A   Derby w/e 21/11/1959
18C   Hasland w/e 06/01/1962
17B   Burton w/e 26/05/1962
17A   Derby w/e 23/06/1962
15D   Coalville w/e 25/08/1962
17A   Derby w/e 01/09/1962
16J   Rowsley w/e 23/11/1963
16C   Derby w/e 02/05/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 06/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 8D Widnes 6w/e 11/07/1959
EXLOAN 6A Chester (MR) 8w/e 05/09/1959
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 16J Rowsley 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 16C Derby 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN   w/e 06/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/11/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 47006
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)
   
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
22/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
26/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15D)    
01/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (16J)    
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
06/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 47006    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev