Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58194 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
Tue 01/01/1878 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1956 |
Service Life |
78 yrs , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58194 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
02/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58194 |
|
|